EP4113790 - METHOD FOR IMPREGNATING, REINFORCING OR ELECTRICALLY INSULATING A BODY CARRYING SINGLE-LAYER OR MULTILAYER WINDINGS AND SYSTEM FOR IMPLEMENTING THE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innomotics GmbH Vogelweiherstraße 1-15 90441 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/23] |
Former [2023/01] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Büttner, Klaus 97618 Hollstadt / DE | 02 /
Katzenberger, Tobias 97631 Bad Königshofen STT Untereßfeld / DE | 03 /
Kirchner, Klaus 97645 Ostheim / DE | 04 /
Plochmann, Bastian 91413 Neustadt an der Aisch / DE | 05 /
Warmuth, Matthias 97618 Windshausen / DE | [2023/01] | Representative(s) | Siemens Patent Attorneys Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 22191945.9 | 13.01.2021 | [2023/01] | Priority number, date | EP20200159310 | 25.02.2020 Original published format: EP 20159310 | [2023/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4113790 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02K1/04, H01F41/12, H02K15/12, H02K3/38, H02K5/08 | [2023/01] | CPC: |
H02K15/12 (EP,US);
H01F41/127 (EP);
H02K1/04 (EP);
H02K3/38 (EP);
H02K5/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM IMPRÄGNIEREN, VERFESTIGEN ODER ELEKTROISOLIEREN EINES EIN- ODER MEHRLAGIGE WICKLUNGEN TRAGENDEN KÖRPERS SOWIE ANLAGE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DAZU | [2023/01] | English: | METHOD FOR IMPREGNATING, REINFORCING OR ELECTRICALLY INSULATING A BODY CARRYING SINGLE-LAYER OR MULTILAYER WINDINGS AND SYSTEM FOR IMPLEMENTING THE METHOD | [2023/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRÉGNATION, DE SOLIDIFICATION OU D'ISOLATION ÉLECTRIQUE D'UN CORPS PORTANT DES ENROULEMENTS MONO OU MULTICOUCHE, AINSI QU'INSTALLATION DESTINÉE À LA MISE EN UVRE ASSOCIÉE | [2023/01] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/32] | 03.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP21701911.6 / EP4066353 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE1212204 (ELEKTROTECHNIK M B H GES) [X] 11 * abstract * * column 2, lines 18-40 * * column 5, lines 10-44 * [A] 1-10,12-14; | [I]JPS5728319 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND CO) [I] 1,10,12-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US4344006 (MENDELSOHN MORRIS A) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, lines 31-45 *; | [XI]DE3541235 (GANZ VILLAMOSSAGI MUEVEK [HU]) [X] 1,10,12 * column 4, lines 17-35; claim 1 * [I] 13,14; | [XI]EP0509366 (KRESS ELEKTRIK GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 11 * abstract * * column 2, line 45 - column 3, line 8 * * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 19 * * column 4, line 34 - column 7, line 32 * [I] 1-10,12-14; | [I]DE19648134 (BECK & CO AG DR [DE]) [I] 1,10,12-14 * page 1, paragraph 1 ** claims 11, 12 *; | [A]WO2012052928 (ANSALDO ENERGIA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 4, line 16 - page 6, line 32 *; | [XI]DE102017001939 (COPPERING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5,10-12 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0046] * [I] 3,4,6-9,13,14 | by applicant | DE102013017299 |