EP4144943 - DUAL LOCK ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMS Australia Pty Ltd 6/13 Brookes Street Mitchell, ACT 2911 / AU | [2023/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEISK, Trevor Mitchell, ACT 2911 / AU | [2023/44] |
Former [2023/10] | 01 /
LEISK, Trevor Mitchell ACT, 2911 / AU | Representative(s) | Savi, Massimiliano, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [2023/10] | Application number, filing date | 22191947.5 | 24.08.2022 | [2023/10] | Priority number, date | AU20210221534 | 24.08.2021 Original published format: AU 2021221534 | [2023/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4144943 | Date: | 08.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E05B65/10, E05B63/14, E05B53/00 | [2023/10] | CPC: |
E05B65/1066 (EP,AU);
E05B1/003 (AU);
E05B53/00 (EP);
E05B63/14 (EP);
E05B63/143 (AU);
E05Y2201/71 (AU);
E05Y2900/132 (AU)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] |
Former [2023/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DOPPELVERRIEGELUNGSAKTUATOR | [2023/10] | English: | DUAL LOCK ACTUATOR | [2023/10] | French: | ACTIONNEUR À DOUBLE VERROUILLAGE | [2023/10] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 07.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.09.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 13.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 13.11.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 13.11.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.11.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US1646990 (BERTRAM BOLLES WILLIAM) [X] 1 * page 1, line 57 - page 4, line 36; figures 1-5 *[I] 2-4; | [X]EP0989268 (EXIT PAINIKE KY [FI]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]EP3023562 (ASSA ABLOY AUBE ANJOU [FR]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0039]; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US2019194975 (DUNNIGAN ADAM [US], et al) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [XI]US10597910 (CHEN LAWRENCE [CN], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 37 - column 10, line 44; figures 1-16 * [I] 3,4 | by applicant | AU2010202397 |