EP4174268 - SLIDING DOOR ROLLER FITTING AND ASSOCIATED SLIDING DOOR ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.11.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, PL, PT, SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Häfele SE & Co KG Adolf-Häfele-Strasse 1 72202 Nagold / DE | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARNOLD, Lorenz 6314 Unterägeri / CH | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 22191973.1 | 24.08.2022 | [2023/18] | Priority number, date | EP20210205101 | 27.10.2021 Original published format: EP 21205101 | [2023/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174268 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4174268 | Date: | 31.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E05D5/10 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
E05D5/10 (EP);
E05D15/10 (US);
E05D15/581 (US);
E05D2015/1028 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/626 (EP);
E05Y2201/638 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/18] | Title | German: | SCHIEBETÜRROLLENBESCHLAG UND ZUGEHÖRIGE SCHIEBETÜRENANORDNUNG | [2023/18] | English: | SLIDING DOOR ROLLER FITTING AND ASSOCIATED SLIDING DOOR ARRANGEMENT | [2023/18] | French: | FERRURE ROULANTE DE PORTE COULISSANTE ET AGENCEMENT DE PORTE COULISSANTE ASSOCIÉ | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/18] | 29.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 30.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 31.01.2024 | ES | 31.01.2024 | FI | 31.01.2024 | HR | 31.01.2024 | LT | 31.01.2024 | LV | 31.01.2024 | NL | 31.01.2024 | PL | 31.01.2024 | SE | 31.01.2024 | NO | 30.04.2024 | RS | 30.04.2024 | GR | 01.05.2024 | IS | 31.05.2024 | PT | 31.05.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | BG | 31.01.2024 | |
ES | 31.01.2024 | ||
FI | 31.01.2024 | ||
HR | 31.01.2024 | ||
LT | 31.01.2024 | ||
NL | 31.01.2024 | ||
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
RS | 30.04.2024 | ||
GR | 01.05.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 31.01.2024 | |
NO | 30.04.2024 | ||
IS | 31.05.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 31.05.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0027261 (STRAUB THEODOR [DE]) [A] 1-15 * page 6, line 32 - page 10, line 13 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE3545971 (WEIDTMANN WILHELM KG) [A] 1-15 * column 6, line 64 - column 9, line 55 ** figures 1-4 * |