EP4332239 - MIR-BASED ASSAY FOR GASTRO-ENTERO-PANCREATIC NEUROENDOCRINE TUMOR DIAGNOSIS AND PROGNOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Istituto Romagnolo per lo Studio dei Tumori "Dino Amadori" - IRST S.r.l. Via Pietro Maroncelli 40 47014 Meldola (FC) / IT | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paganelli, Giovanni 47014 Meldola (FC) / IT | 02 /
Mazza, Massimiliano 47014 Meldola (FC) / IT | 03 /
Bocchini, Martine 47014 Meldola (FC) / IT | 04 /
Nicolini, Fabio 47014 Meldola (FC) / IT | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Pace Napoleone, Maria, et al De Simone & Partners S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20 00198 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2024/10] | Ghirardi, Valeria, et al De Simone & Partners S.r.l. Via Vincenzo Bellini, 20 00198 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 22192866.6 | 30.08.2022 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4332239 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6886 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
C12Q2600/106 (EP);
C12Q2600/118 (EP);
C12Q2600/178 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIR-BASIERTER TEST ZUR DIAGNOSE UND PROGNOSE VON GASTRO-ENTERO-PANKREATISCHEN NEUROENDOKRINEN TUMOREN | [2024/10] | English: | MIR-BASED ASSAY FOR GASTRO-ENTERO-PANCREATIC NEUROENDOCRINE TUMOR DIAGNOSIS AND PROGNOSIS | [2024/10] | French: | ANALYSE À BASE DE MIR POUR LE DIAGNOSTIC ET LE PRONOSTIC DES TUMEURS NEUROENDOCRINES GASTRO-ENTÉRO-PANCRÉATIQUES | [2024/10] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2020255906 (YASUI TAKAO [JP], et al) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0046]; claims 8,11 *; | [I] - HAVASI ANDREI ET AL, "Current and New Challenges in the Management of Pancreatic Neuroendocrine Tumors: The Role of miRNA-Based Approaches as New Reliable Biomarkers", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR SCIENCES, (20220120), vol. 23, no. 3, doi:10.3390/ijms23031109, page 1109, XP093018570 [I] 6,14-17 * abstract * * page 12; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/ijms23031109 | [Y] - BOCCHINI M ET AL, "ENDOCRINE TUMOURS 606P Novel miRNA-based assay for GEP-NENs management", ANNALS OF ONCOLOGY, vol. 31, no. S4, (20200930), page S505, URL: https://www.annalsofoncology.org/action/showPdf?pii=S0923-7534(20)40462-4, XP093018470 [Y] 20,21 * abstract * | [Y] - Bocchini Martine, "Novel prognostic miRNAs-based assay for PanNEN management and treatment", (20200930), pages 1 - 1, URL: https://register.event-works.com/elsevier/esmovirtual2020/ps/pd/id/80221/, (20230202), XP093020370 [Y] 20,21 * the whole document * | [IY] - Mazza Massimiliano, "CV", (20220731), URL: https://www.serinar.unibo.it/wp-content/uploads/2022/07/cv22Mazza_Massimiliano.pdf, (20230127), XP093018557 [I] 1-5,7-13,18,19,22 * page 3 * [Y] 20,21 | [A] - NANAYAKKARA JINA ET AL, "Characterizing and classifying neuroendocrine neoplasms through microRNA sequencing and data mining", NAR CANCER, vol. 2, no. 3, doi:10.1093/narcan/zcaa009, (20200901), URL: https://watermark.silverchair.com/zcaa009.pdf?token=AQECAHi208BE49Ooan9kkhW_Ercy7Dm3ZL_9Cf3qfKAc485ysgAAAucwggLjBgkqhkiG9w0BBwagggLUMIIC0AIBADCCAskGCSqGSIb3DQEHATAeBglghkgBZQMEAS4wEQQMzbbgAeJXaByQXEYyAgEQgIICmhUXDMrLSpMmCiWJ1eVa0_wmZuzFfvzVgPnWWQx_U8mqpbGfRJwLaLBh4Cgu2Hb-JA6JXHydIl5pz1ev0ZBaMp71DJk4, XP093018254 [A] 1-22 * abstract * * page 10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/narcan/zcaa009 | [A] - JO HANHEE ET AL, "Elevated miR-16-5p induces somatostatin receptor 2 expression in neuroendocrine tumor cells", PLOS ONE, vol. 15, no. 10, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0240107, (20201012), page e0240107, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC7549806/pdf/pone.0240107.pdf, XP093018424 [A] 1-22 * abstract * * page 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0240107 | by applicant | WO9914226 | WO0056746 | WO0056748 | WO0125248 | WO0228875 | WO03006475 | WO03095467 | - SIDHOM KOBI POSALEEM A, "A Review of Exosomal Isolation Methods: Is Size Exclusion Chromatography the Best Option?", Int J Mol Sci., (20200904), vol. 21, no. 18, doi:10.3390/ijms21186466, page 6466, XP055936778 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3390/ijms21186466 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. NM 001050.03 | - Nature reviews genetics, (20110500), vol. 12, no. 5, page 341 | - ANDREASI VPARTELLI SMUFFATTI FMANZONI MFCAPURSO GFALCONI M, "Update on gastroenteropancreatic neuroendocrine tumors", Dig Liver Dis, (20210000), vol. 53, doi:10.1016/j.dld.2020.08.031, pages 171 - 82, XP086442081 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.dld.2020.08.031 | - DASARI ASHEN CHALPERIN D et al., "Trends in the incidence, prevalence, and survival outcomes in patients with neuroendocrine tumors in the United States", JAMA Oncol, (20170000), page 3 | - NAGTEGAAL IDODZE RDKLIMSTRA D et al., "The 2019 WHO classification of tumours of the digestive system", Histopathology, (20200000), vol. 76, pages 182 - 8 | - INZANI FPETRONE GRINDI G, "The New World Health Organization Classification for Pancreatic Neuroendocrine Neoplasia", EndocrinolMetab Clin North Am, (20180000), vol. 47, pages 463 - 70 | - HOE J, KIM KW, KIM HJ, "What Is New in the 2017 World Health Organization Classification and 8th American Joint Committee on Cancer Staging System for Pancreatic Neuroendocrine tumors? ", Korean JRadiol, (20190000), vol. 20, pages 5 - 17 | - MAFFICINI ASCARPA A, "Genomic landscape of pancreatic neuroendocrine tumours: The International Cancer Genome Consortium", JEndocrinol, (20180000), vol. 236, pages R161 - 7 | - GUENTER R, AWEDA T, CARMONA MATOS DM, "Overexpression of somatostatin receptor type 2 in neuroendocrine tumors for improved Ga68-DOTATATE imaging and treatment", Surg (United States, (20200000), vol. 167, doi:10.1016/j.surg.2019.05.092, pages 189 - 96, XP085942081 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.surg.2019.05.092 | - BBODEI L, AMBROSINI V, HERRMANN K, MODLIN I, "Current concepts in68Ga-DOTATATE imaging of neuroendocrine tumors: Interpretation, biodistribution, dosimetry, and molecular strategies", J Nucl Med, (20170000), vol. 58, pages 1718 - 26 | - OBERG KEREUBI JKWEKKEBOOM DJKRENNING EP, "Role of somatostatins in gastroenteropancreatic neuroendocrine tumor development and therapy", Gastroenterology, (20100000), vol. 139, pages 742 - 753 | - KWEE TCBASU SSABOURY BAMBROSINI VTORIGIAN DAALAVI A, "A new dimension of FDG-PET interpretation: Assessment of tumor biology", Eur J Nucl MedMol Imaging, (20110000), vol. 38, doi:10.1007/s00259-010-1713-9, pages 1158 - 70, XP019902586 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00259-010-1713-9 | - BINDERUP TKNIGGE ULOFT AFEDERSPIEL BKJAER A, "18F-fluorodeoxyglucose positron emission tomography predicts survival of patients with neuroendocrine tumors", Clin Cancer, (20100000), vol. 16, pages 978 - 85 | - BAUM RPKULKARNI HRSINGH A et al., "Results and adverse events of personalized peptide receptor radionuclide therapy with 90Yttrium and 177Lutetium in 1048 patients with neuroendocrine tumors", Oncotarget, (20180000), vol. 9, pages 16932 - 50 | - KWEKKEBOOM DJKAM BLVAN ESSEN M et al., "Somatostatin receptor-based imaging and therapy of gastroenteropancreatic neuroendocrine tumors", Endocr Relat Cancer, (20100000), page 17 | - BODEI LSCHODER HBAUM RP et al., "Molecular profiling of neuroendocrine tumours to predict response and toxicity to peptide receptor radionuclide therapy", Lancet Oncol, (20200000), vol. 21, pages e431 - 43 | - BODEI LKIDD MMODLIN IM et al., "Measurement of circulating transcripts and gene cluster analysis predicts and defines therapeutic efficacy of peptide receptor radionuclide therapy (PRRT) in neuroendocrine tumors", Eur J Nucl MedMol Imaging, (20160000), vol. 43, doi:10.1007/s00259-015-3250-z, XP055548293 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00259-015-3250-z | - BENTEN DBEHRANG YUNRAU L et al., "Establishment of the first well-differentiated human pancreatic neuroendocrine tumor model", Mol Cancer Res, (20180000), vol. 16, pages 496 - 507 | - GAO YGAO HWANG G et al., "A meta-analysis of Prognostic factor of Pancreatic neuroendocrine tumors", Sci Rep, (20180000), vol. 8, pages 1 - 8 | - LUO YCHEN XCHEN J et al., "Preoperative Prediction of Pancreatic Neuroendocrine tumors Grading Based on Enhanced Computed Tomography Imaging: Validation of Deep Learning with a Convolutional Neural Network", Neuroendocrinology, (20200000), vol. 110, pages 338 - 50 | - OBERG KKRENNING ESUNDIN A et al., "A delphic consensus assessment: Imaging and biomarkers in gastroenteropancreatic neuroendocrine tumor disease management", Endocr Connect, (20160000), vol. 5, pages 174 - 87 |