EP4167484 - DRIVER CIRCUIT WITH ENHANCED CONTROL FOR CURRENT AND VOLTAGE SLEW RATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics S.r.l. Via C. Olivetti, 2 20864 Agrate Brianza (MB) / IT | [2023/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CIGNOLI, Marco 27100 Pavia / IT | [2024/15] |
Former [2023/16] | 01 /
CIGNOLI, Marco I-27100 Pavia / IT | Representative(s) | Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emmanuele II, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/16] | Bosotti, Luciano Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 22192903.7 | 30.08.2022 | [2023/16] | Priority number, date | US202117502200 | 15.10.2021 Original published format: US202117502200 | [2023/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4167484 | Date: | 19.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4167484 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/16, H03K17/73 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
H03K19/00361 (EP,US);
H03K17/223 (US);
H03K17/165 (EP);
H03K17/687 (US);
H03K17/731 (EP);
H03K2217/0063 (EP,US);
H03K2217/0072 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/35] |
Former [2023/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TREIBERSCHALTUNG MIT VERBESSERTER STEUERUNG FÜR STROM- UND SPANNUNGSANSTIEGSRATEN | [2023/16] | English: | DRIVER CIRCUIT WITH ENHANCED CONTROL FOR CURRENT AND VOLTAGE SLEW RATES | [2023/16] | French: | CIRCUIT D'ATTAQUE AVEC CONTRÔLE AMÉLIORÉ DES VITESSES DE BALAYAGE DU COURANT ET DE LA TENSION | [2023/16] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/35] | 24.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2020250907 (DENSO CORP [JP]); | [A]US2021159774 (GUILLOT LAURENT [FR], et al); | [P]US2022103061 (AOKI YASUAKI [JP], et al) |