EP4119561 - HETEROARYL-KETONE FUSED AZADECALIN GLUCOCORTICOID RECEPTOR MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | 08.08.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corcept Therapeutics Incorporated 101 Redwood Shores Parkway Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/35] | For all designated states Corcept Therapeutics Incorporated 101 Redwood Shores Parkway Redwood City, CA 94065 / US | ||
Former [2023/03] | For all designated states Corcept Therapeutics Incorporated 149 Commonwealth Drive Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUNT, Hazel Storrington / GB | 02 /
JOHNSON, Tony Harlow / GB | 03 /
RAY, Nicholas Harlow / GB | 04 /
WALTERS, Iain Nottingham / GB | [2023/03] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/03] | Application number, filing date | 22193438.3 | 24.05.2013 | [2023/03] | Priority number, date | US201261651669P | 25.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261651669 P | US201261691083P | 20.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261691083 P | US201261715907P | 19.10.2012 Original published format: US 201261715907 P | US201361759520P | 01.02.2013 Original published format: US 201361759520 P | US201361781629P | 14.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361781629 P | [2023/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4119561 | Date: | 18.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4119561 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K31/5377, A61P25/24 | [2023/03] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,KR,RU);
A61K31/4725 (RU);
A61K31/497 (RU);
A61K31/506 (RU);
A61K31/5377 (KR,RU);
A61K31/5383 (RU);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/46 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] |
Former [2023/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HETEROARYL-KETON-KONDENSIERTE AZADECALINE ALS MODULATOREN DES GLUCOCORTICOIDREZEPTORS | [2023/03] | English: | HETEROARYL-KETONE FUSED AZADECALIN GLUCOCORTICOID RECEPTOR MODULATORS | [2023/03] | French: | MODULATEURS DU RÉCEPTEUR DES GLUCOCORTICOÏDES D'AZADÉCALINE FUSIONNÉ D'HÉTÉROARYL DE CÉTONE | [2023/03] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2023 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 27.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13793417.0 / EP2854814 | EP18154256.4 / EP3338781 | EP19188885.8 / EP3590517 | EP21154665.0 / EP3851107 | Divisional application(s) | EP24192650.0 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005087769 (CORCEPT THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2012027702 (CORCEPT THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) |