EP4332042 - SETTING A RESCUE TIME PERIOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Otis Elevator Company One Carrier Place Farmington, Connecticut 06032 / US | [2024/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gehrke, Sebastian 13507 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Hoinkis, Matthias 13507 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Ruhnke, Jan 13507 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Herkel, Peter 13507 Berlin / DE | [2024/10] | Representative(s) | Dehns 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/10] | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 22193981.2 | 05.09.2022 | [2024/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4332042 | Date: | 06.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/02, B66B5/00 | [2024/10] | CPC: |
B66B5/027 (EP,CN,US);
B66B5/16 (US);
B66B1/3407 (US);
B66B1/3423 (US);
B66B5/0037 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/38] |
Former [2024/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSTELLUNG EINER RETTUNGSZEITPERIODE | [2024/10] | English: | SETTING A RESCUE TIME PERIOD | [2024/10] | French: | RÉGLAGE D'UNE PÉRIODE DE SECOURS | [2024/10] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2024 | Examination requested [2024/38] | 13.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008202859 (TEGTMEIER DIRK HEINRICH [DE], et al); | [A]JP2013091572 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]US2022055861 (SONNENMOSER ASTRID [US], et al) |