EP4155601 - CRYOGENIC STORAGE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAGNA STEYR Fahrzeugtechnik GmbH & Co KG Liebenauer Hauptstraße 317 8041 Graz / AT | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STUBENRAUCH, Martin 8142 Wundschuh / AT | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Zangger, Bernd Magna International Europe GmbH Patentabteilung Liebenauer Hauptstraße 317 8041 Graz / AT | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 22194030.7 | 06.09.2022 | [2023/13] | Priority number, date | DE202110210616 | 23.09.2021 Original published format: DE102021210616 | [2023/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4155601 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F17C3/08 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
F17C3/08 (EP,US);
F17C2201/0104 (EP);
F17C2201/035 (EP);
F17C2201/054 (EP);
F17C2201/056 (EP);
F17C2203/0391 (EP,US);
F17C2203/0629 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0326 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0352 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0355 (EP);
F17C2205/0391 (EP);
F17C2221/012 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0153 (EP);
F17C2223/0161 (US);
F17C2223/033 (EP);
F17C2223/043 (EP);
F17C2223/046 (EP);
F17C2223/047 (EP);
F17C2225/0123 (EP);
F17C2225/033 (EP);
F17C2227/0107 (EP);
F17C2227/0302 (US);
F17C2227/0311 (EP);
F17C2227/0323 (EP);
F17C2227/0381 (EP);
F17C2227/039 (EP);
F17C2227/0393 (EP);
F17C2250/032 (EP);
F17C2250/0626 (EP);
F17C2260/046 (EP);
F17C2265/066 (EP);
F17C2270/0105 (EP);
F17C2270/0168 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] |
Former [2023/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KRYOGEN-SPEICHERSYSTEM | [2023/13] | English: | CRYOGENIC STORAGE SYSTEM | [2023/13] | French: | SYSTÈME DE STOCKAGE DE CRYOGÈNE | [2023/13] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 21.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1180637 (MESSER GRIESHEIM GMBH [DE]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0005] , [0007]; figures 1-3 *; | [XI]DE19645488 (AIR LIQUIDE DEUTSCHLAND GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,8 * paragraphs [0019] - [0027]; figure 2 * [I] 4-7,9 |