EP4161106 - SPATIAL AUDIO CAPTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMMI, Mikko Tapio 33310 Tampere / FI | 02 /
MÄKINEN, Toni Henrik 33950 Pirkkala / FI | 03 /
LAITINEN, Mikko-Ville 02130 Espoo / FI | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/14] | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | Application number, filing date | 22194746.8 | 09.09.2022 | [2023/14] | Priority number, date | GB20210014186 | 04.10.2021 Original published format: GB 202114186 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4161106 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04S7/00 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
H04S7/30 (EP,GB);
H04R1/406 (US);
H04S3/00 (GB);
H04S7/302 (GB);
H04S7/305 (GB);
H04S2400/15 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] |
Former [2023/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÄUMLICHE AUDIOERFASSUNG | [2023/14] | English: | SPATIAL AUDIO CAPTURE | [2023/14] | French: | CAPTURE AUDIO SPATIALE | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 05.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2021076130 (LAITINEN MIKKO-VILLE [FI], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,13-15 * paragraph [0118] - paragraph [0136]; figure 6 * [I] 4,5,9-12; | [XI]WO2021053266 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [X] 1-3,14 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0089] *[I] 4-13,15; | [XI]GB2590651 (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [X] 1-3,8,13,14 * page 21, line 19 - page 22, line 16 * [I] 4-7,9-12 | by applicant | US9313599 | EP3791605 |