EP4125243 - HASH-BASED MULTI-HOMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORCKIT IP, LLC 831 Beacon Street Suite 307 Newton, MA 02459 / US | [2023/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGMON, Gideon 44601 Kfar Sava / IL | 02 /
ZELIG, David 52255 Ramat Gan / IL | 03 /
MENAHEMI, Zvika 71700 Modi'in / IL | [2023/05] | Representative(s) | Kurig, Thomas Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [2023/05] | Application number, filing date | 22195356.5 | 12.11.2007 | [2023/05] | Priority number, date | US20060559037 | 13.11.2006 Original published format: US 559037 | US20070778286 | 16.07.2007 Original published format: US 778286 | [2023/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4125243 | Date: | 01.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/46 | [2023/05] | CPC: |
H04L12/4641 (EP,US);
H04L12/50 (KR);
H04L12/4625 (EP);
H04L45/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04L45/245 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2023/33] |
Former [2023/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HASH-BASIERTES MULTIHOMING | [2023/05] | English: | HASH-BASED MULTI-HOMING | [2023/05] | French: | MULTIHÉBERGEMENT BASÉ SUR LE HACHAGE | [2023/05] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 10.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07827358.8 / EP2104994 | EP17185828.5 / EP3267637 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003128706 (MARK BARRY DING KEN [CA], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0030] - [0048]; figure 4A *; | [XA]US2003223424 (ANDERSON ERIC [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0003] - [0007] - [0024] - [0047]; figures 1,6,7 * [A] 3-19; | [A]US6778495 (BLAIR DANA [US]) [A] 1-19 * column 5, line 40 - column 11, line 11 *; | [A] - JU-YEON JO ET AL, "Hash-based internet traffic load balancing", INFORMATION REUSE AND INTEGRATION, 2004. IRI 2004. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2004 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON LAS VEGAS, NV, USA NOV. 8-10, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20041108), doi:10.1109/IRI.2004.1431461, ISBN 978-0-7803-8819-2, pages 204 - 209, XP010798675 [A] 1-19 * abstract * * sections 1 and 2; pages 204-207 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IRI.2004.1431461 |