EP4159917 - BELT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 15.09.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] | 15.09.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valmet Technologies Oy Keilasatama 5 02150 Espoo / FI | [2023/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIIHIOJA, Vesa-Matti 33101 Tampere / FI | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 22195512.3 | 14.09.2022 | [2023/14] | Priority number, date | FI20210006016 | 30.09.2021 Original published format: FI 20216016 | [2023/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4159917 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | D21F3/02 | [2023/14] | CPC: |
D21F3/0227 (EP,FI,KR);
C08F283/006 (US);
B29D29/00 (KR);
C08G18/61 (FI);
D21F3/0236 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] |
Former [2023/14] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GURTBAND | [2023/14] | English: | BELT | [2023/14] | French: | CEINTURE | [2023/14] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | 12.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006054498 (ICHIKAWA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-17 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph 2 *; | [X]DE102012215613 (VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-17 * claim - *; | [X]WO2014037268 (VOITH PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-17 * claim - *; | [A]DE102013217661 (LEIBNIZ INST FÜR POLYMERFORSCHUNG DRESDEN E V [DE]) [A] 1-17* paragraph [0001]; claims 1,4,8 *; | [A]DE102018204884 (SCHAEFERROLLS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0019] - [0030]; claim - *; | [X]US2020165776 (DELMAS DELPHINE [DE]) [X] 1-17 * paragraph [0025] *; | [X]EP3875681 (ICHIKAWA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0057] - [0060] - [0079]; figure - * |