EP4339293 - METHOD FOR ENZYMATIC MODIFICATION OF STARCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Südstärke GmbH Königslachener Weg 2A 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang Halter, Evi 86529 Schrobenhausen / DE | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 22195543.8 | 14.09.2022 | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4339293 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12P19/02, C12P19/04, C12P19/14 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
C12P19/02 (EP);
C12P19/04 (EP);
C12P19/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENZYMATISCHEN MODIFIZIERUNG VON STÄRKE | [2024/12] | English: | METHOD FOR ENZYMATIC MODIFICATION OF STARCH | [2024/12] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MODIFICATION ENZYMATIQUE D'AMIDON | [2024/12] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2023 | Examination requested [2024/12] | 25.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5562937 (SENKELESKI JAMIE [US], et al) [A] 1-12* example 9 *; | [A]US6228419 (YUAN CHIENKUO RONNIE [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 5, line 7 - line 45 * * column 3, line 32 - line 34 *; | [A]US2002189607 (LAVOIE JAMES P [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * examples 1,2 *; | [A]US2005008761 (PAULUS JEANNE [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * example 4 * | by applicant | CN105211790 | - O. WOLFF, Die Starke, (19500000), pages 273 - 279 |