EP4152783 - VEHICLE AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/12] | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD | ||
[2024/42] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - German title | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - English title | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - French title | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-Ken 471-8571 / JP | For all designated states Denso Ten Limited 2-28 Gosho-dori 1-chome Hyogo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 652-8510 / JP | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Noriaki Toyota-shi, 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
KAWASAKI, Hiroki Toyota-shi, 471-8571 / JP | 03 /
NAKAGAWA, Hiroto Toyota-shi, 471-8571 / JP | 04 /
IKEDA, Satoru Kobe, 652-8510 / JP | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 22195780.6 | 15.09.2022 | [2023/12] | Priority number, date | JP20210153654 | 21.09.2021 Original published format: JP 2021153654 | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4152783 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4152783 | Date: | 14.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/44, H04W48/16, H04W84/12, H04W48/02 | [2024/42] | CPC: |
H04W4/44 (EP);
G05D1/0022 (US);
B60W30/06 (US);
H04W48/16 (EP);
H04W76/10 (US);
H04W48/02 (EP);
H04W84/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/12] | H04W4/40, H04W48/02, H04W48/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUG UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2024/42] | English: | VEHICLE AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD | [2024/42] | French: | VÉHICULE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2024/42] |
Former [2023/12] | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | ||
Former [2023/12] | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS AND INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD | ||
Former [2023/12] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | Examination procedure | 15.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/12] | 06.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 30.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2013078980 (SAITO SOICHI [JP]); | [XI]US2016277966 (NAGASAKA YUSHI [JP], et al); | [A]JP2019168921 (YUPITERU CORP, et al) | by applicant | JP2020522783 |