EP4339034 - CRASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Constellium Singen GmbH Alusingen-Platz 1 78224 Singen / DE | [2024/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUELLER, Andre 78247 HILZINGEN / DE | 02 /
FEUERSTEIN, Martin 78224 SINGEN / DE | [2024/12] | Representative(s) | Constellium - Propriété Industrielle C-TEC Constellium Technology Center Propriété Industrielle Parc Economique Centr'Alp 725, rue Aristide Bergès, CS10027 38341 Voreppe / FR | [2024/12] | Application number, filing date | 22196066.9 | 16.09.2022 | [2024/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4339034 | Date: | 20.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60R19/24 | [2024/12] | CPC: |
B60R19/18 (EP);
B60R19/24 (EP);
B60R19/34 (EP);
B60R2019/182 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CRASHMANAGEMENTSYSTEM FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2024/12] | English: | CRASH MANAGEMENT SYSTEM FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2024/12] | French: | SYSTÈME D ABSORPTION DE CHOC POUR UN VÉHICULE | [2024/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2115359 (BUDD CO) [X] 1,2 * page 2, lines 80-10 * * figure - *; | [X]US5139297 (CARPENTER RONALD A [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure - *; | [X]FR2789955 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1,2* figure - *; | [XI]DE10205627 (SUSPA HOLDING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,11,12,14 * paragraphs [0015] , [0017] , [0018] , [0021] * * figures 4-7 * [I] 3-10,13; | [XI]KR20150080347 (SUNG WOO HITECH CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,10,12 * figures 3-6 * [I] 4-9,11,13,14 | by applicant | DE102004008740 | US2011012381 |