EP4148751 - LONG RANGE COIL AND POWER SOURCE FOR A MAGNETIC FIELD GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Matrix Design Group, LLC 5741 Prospect Drive P.O. Box 1446 Newburgh, IN 47630 / US | [2024/03] |
Former [2023/11] | For all designated states Matrix Design Group LLC 5741 Prospect Drive P.O. Box 1446 Newburgh, IN 47630 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Black, Tim E. Elberfeld, 47613 / US | [2023/11] | Representative(s) | Salomäki, Juha Kari Ensio Salomaki Oy Kankurinkatu 4-6 05800 Hyvinkää / FI | [2023/11] | Application number, filing date | 22196578.3 | 02.05.2019 | [2023/11] | Priority number, date | US201815987478 | 23.05.2018 Original published format: US201815987478 | [2023/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4148751 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/20, H01F5/02, H01F3/10, B60Q9/00, F16P3/12, E02F3/16, F16P3/14, G08B21/22 | [2023/11] | CPC: |
H01F3/10 (EP);
H01F27/42 (US);
F16P3/145 (EP);
G05B9/02 (US);
H01F27/2823 (US);
H01F27/34 (US);
H01F5/02 (EP);
H01F7/202 (EP);
H01F7/204 (EP);
H02H5/12 (US);
E21C41/00 (EP);
H01F2027/2842 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] |
Former [2023/11] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SPULE MIT LANGER REICHWEITE UND STROMQUELLE FÜR EINEN MAGNETFELDGENERATOR | [2023/11] | English: | LONG RANGE COIL AND POWER SOURCE FOR A MAGNETIC FIELD GENERATOR | [2023/11] | French: | BOBINE À LONGUE PORTÉE ET SOURCE D'ALIMENTATION POUR UN GÉNÉRATEUR DE CHAMP MAGNÉTIQUE | [2023/11] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | 07.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19807379.3 / EP3797052 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4618806 (GROUSE ALAN [US]) [AD] 2* column 3, line 33 - column 4, line 58; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]US5579188 (DUNFIELD JOHN C [US], et al) [AD] 2 * column 6, line 22 - column 7, line 15; figures 7,8 *; | [AD]US6512312 (HERKENRATH PETER [DE], et al) [AD] 1 * abstract * * column 6, line 4 - column 8, line 51 *; | [A]US2007282482 (BEUCHER PETER J [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0031] - [0039]; figure 2 * * paragraphs [0074] - [0077]; figure 10 * * paragraphs [0086] - [0088]; figure 13 *; | [A]US2009096693 (JONES ROWLAND [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0040] - [0044] *; | [AD]US2009267787 (PRYOR ARIC [US], et al) [AD] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0048] - [0052]; figure 4 * * paragraphs [0042] - [0047] - [0055] - [0062]; figures 1-3,5 *; | [A]US2010308948 (CHAPMAN PAUL [GB], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0020] - [0029]; figures 1,4,5 *; | [AD]KR20180015470 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [AD] 1 * paragraphs [0048] - [0064]; figures 5,6 * | by applicant | US4618806 | US5579188 | US6512312 | US2009267787 | KR20180015470 |