EP4170235 - METHOD FOR EVALUATING A UNSTEADY PRESSURE DIFFERENCE DETECTED BY A SENSOR AT A GAS HEATER AND CORRESPONDING GAS HEATER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ebm-papst Landshut GmbH Hofmark-Aich-Strasse 25 84030 Landshut / DE | [2023/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VROLIJK, Enno 7751DX Dalen / NL | 02 /
Hermann, Jens 84034 Landshut / DE | 03 /
WEINGART, Markus 84056 Rottenburg / DE | 04 /
Kerschreiter, Andreas 84174 Eching / DE | 05 /
Simon, Bernhard 93059 Regensburg / DE | [2023/17] | Representative(s) | Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Sonnenstraße 19 80331 München / DE | [2023/17] | Application number, filing date | 22196806.8 | 21.09.2022 | [2023/17] | Priority number, date | DE202110127224 | 20.10.2021 Original published format: DE102021127224 | [2023/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4170235 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F23N1/00, F23N5/24 | [2023/17] | CPC: |
F23N1/002 (EP,KR);
F23N5/24 (KR);
F24H15/242 (US);
F23D14/02 (US);
F23D14/64 (KR);
F23D14/72 (US);
F23N5/18 (KR);
F23N5/242 (EP);
F24H1/0027 (KR,US);
F24H15/104 (KR);
G01L23/08 (US);
F23D2900/00003 (KR);
F23K2900/05002 (KR);
F23N2005/185 (KR);
F23N2225/04 (EP);
F23N2225/06 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] |
Former [2023/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUSWERTUNG EINER VON EINEM SENSOR ERFASSBAREN INSTATIONÄREN DRUCKDIFFERENZ AN EINER GASTHERME SOWIE ZUGEHÖRIGE GASTHERME | [2023/17] | English: | METHOD FOR EVALUATING A UNSTEADY PRESSURE DIFFERENCE DETECTED BY A SENSOR AT A GAS HEATER AND CORRESPONDING GAS HEATER | [2023/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉVALUATION D'UNE DIFFÉRENCE DE PRESSION INSTATIONNAIRE D'UN CAPTEUR SUR UNE CHAUDIÈRE À GAZ ET CHAUDIÈRE À GAZ ASSOCIÉE | [2023/17] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 20.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6026219 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]EP0450173 (LANDIS & GYR BETRIEBS AG [CH]); | [IA]EP2466202 (VAILLANT GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP2966354 (HONEYWELL TECHNOLOGIES SARL [CH]) |