EP4342844 - HYDROGEN PRODUCTION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.03.2024 [2024/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Net Zero Scientific Ltd 64 Heath Drive Romford RM2 5QR / GB | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Alan Michael Romford, RM2 5QR / GB | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 22197409.0 | 23.09.2022 | [2024/13] | Priority number, date | GB20220013860 | 22.09.2022 Original published format: GB 202213860 | [2024/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4342844 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/08 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
C01B3/08 (EP);
Y02E60/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WASSERSTOFF | [2024/13] | English: | HYDROGEN PRODUCTION PROCESS | [2024/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'HYDROGÈNE | [2024/13] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CA2314403 (ANDERSEN ERLING REIDAR [NO], et al) [X] 1,3,7,11,15 * abstract * * claim 1 * * page 7, lines 2-5 * * page 10, lines 6-9, 21 * * page 17, lines 1-8 * * figures 5,14 * [Y] 4,5; | [XYI]US7144567 (ANDERSEN ERLING JIM [CA]) [X] 1,3,9,11,15 * abstract * * claim 1 * * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 4 * * column 4, lines 18-20, 32-44,58-64 * * column 6, lines 13-25 * * column 7, line 6 * * column 16, line 59 - column 17, line 7 * [Y] 4,5 [I] 6; | [XYI]WO2011124189 (MOUREK LUKAS [CZ]) [X] 1-3,7-9,11,13-15 * abstract * * claims 1,5 * * page 3, lines 8-10 * * page 4, lines 29-32 * * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 7 * * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 15 * [Y] 4,5 [I] 10; | [Y]WO2017080245 (YAN LIRONG [CN]) [Y] 5 * claim 1 *; | [A]TWI618673B (UNIV NAT TSING HUA [TW], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract ** paragraph [0013] *; | [YA]CN109734049 (TECHNICAL INST PHYSICS & CHEMISTRY CAS) [Y] 4 * claims 1,2,5,6 * [A] 1-3,5-15 |