EP4163406 - MANUFACTURING METHOD OF METAL MEMBER WITH RESIDUAL STRESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sintokogio, Ltd. 28-12, Meieki 3-chome Nakamura-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 450-6424 / JP | [2023/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saito, Yuta Nagoya-shi, Aichi, 450-6424 / JP | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/15] | Application number, filing date | 22198025.3 | 27.09.2022 | [2023/15] | Priority number, date | JP20210163888 | 05.10.2021 Original published format: JP 2021163888 | [2023/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4163406 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C21D10/00, C22F1/04, C21D7/06, C21D1/09, C21D1/30, C21D6/00 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
C22F1/04 (EP,US);
C21D1/09 (EP);
C21D1/30 (EP);
C21D10/005 (EP);
C21D6/00 (EP);
C21D7/06 (EP);
Y02P10/20 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/29] |
Former [2023/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR METALLELEMENT MIT RESTSPANNUNG | [2023/15] | English: | MANUFACTURING METHOD OF METAL MEMBER WITH RESIDUAL STRESS | [2023/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT MÉTALLIQUE À CONTRAINTE RÉSIDUELLE | [2023/15] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/29] | 12.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH05179411 (MAZDA MOTOR) [X] 1-3,6 * § 0018, 0025; fig 1, 15 * [I] 4,5; | [XI]WO2012133885 (NHK SPRING CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,3 * § 0043; fig. 1 (B) * [I] 4,5; | [XI]EP2682493 (NHK SPRING CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,3 * § 0045-0048; fig. 1 * [I] 4,5; | [A] - KULEKCI MUSTAFA KEMAL ET AL, "Critical analysis of processes and apparatus for industrial surface peening technologies", THE INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF ADVANCED MANUFACTURING TECHNOLOGY, SPRINGER, LONDON, vol. 74, no. 9, doi:10.1007/S00170-014-6088-9, ISSN 0268-3768, (20140704), pages 1551 - 1565, (20140704), XP035403420 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00170-014-6088-9 | by applicant | JP2015121262 |