EP4250256 - INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, PROGRAM, AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.08.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujifilm Business Innovation Corp. 7-3, Akasaka 9-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2023/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIZUKA, Miho Yokohama / JP | [2023/39] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2023/39] | Application number, filing date | 22198478.4 | 28.09.2022 | [2023/39] | Priority number, date | JP20220045893 | 22.03.2022 Original published format: JP 2022045893 | [2023/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4250256 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06V30/412, G06V30/10, G06V30/14 | [2023/39] | CPC: |
G06V30/10 (EP);
G06F40/174 (US);
G06F17/11 (US);
G06V30/1456 (EP);
G06V30/19173 (US);
G06V30/28 (US);
G06V30/412 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, PROGRAMM UND VERFAHREN ZUR INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNG | [2023/39] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS, PROGRAM, AND METHOD FOR PROCESSING INFORMATION | [2023/39] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROGRAMME ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2023/39] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/35] | 19.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2024/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0374785 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [X]US2001043740 (ICHIKAWA YUKIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * [0009]-[0010],[0039],[0045],[0048]-[0052];; figures 2-7,9 *; | [A]US2019139280 (HUBEL OLAF [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2015184815 | JP2021047688 |