EP4329314 - CONTENTS NAVIGATION METHOD FOR OTT SERVICE OF HETEROGENEOUS CONTENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | 26.01.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aloys Inc 7F, 4-5, Yanghyeon-ro, 405beon-gil Jungwon-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 13438 / KR | [2024/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Sung Hyeok 16318 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
KIM, Kyung Hun 13640 Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2024/09] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2024/09] | Application number, filing date | 22198923.9 | 30.09.2022 | [2024/09] | Priority number, date | KR20220104695 | 22.08.2022 Original published format: KR 20220104695 | [2024/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4329314 | Date: | 28.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/2187, G06F3/0482, H04N21/422, H04N21/431, H04N21/472, H04N21/482, H04N21/222, H04N21/254, H04N21/266, H04N21/84 | [2024/09] | CPC: |
H04N21/4828 (EP,US);
H04N21/2365 (BR);
H04N21/482 (KR);
G06F3/0482 (EP);
G06V20/41 (US);
H04N21/2187 (EP);
H04N21/222 (EP);
H04N21/266 (EP);
H04N21/42204 (EP,KR);
H04N21/4221 (EP);
H04N21/42216 (EP);
H04N21/4312 (EP,KR);
H04N21/432 (KR);
H04N21/435 (KR);
H04N21/47202 (EP);
H04N21/4821 (EP);
H04N21/4826 (US);
H04N21/84 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INHALTSNAVIGATIONSVERFAHREN FÜR OTT-DIENST HETEROGENER INHALTE | [2024/09] | English: | CONTENTS NAVIGATION METHOD FOR OTT SERVICE OF HETEROGENEOUS CONTENTS | [2024/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE NAVIGATION DE CONTENUS POUR SERVICE OTT DE CONTENUS HÉTÉROGÈNES | [2024/09] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2022 | Examination requested [2024/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010153885 (YATES DOUG [US]); | [A]US2012019732 (LEE HANEUL [KR], et al); | [I]WO2014046816 (FLEXTRONICS AP LLC [US]); | [A]US2015163523 (BENYA ROBERT [US], et al); | [I]US2018307760 (WITTKE DAVID GERALD [US]); | [A]US2021105520 (RAMARAJ JAYAPRAKASH [IN], et al) | by applicant | KR20170132867 | KR20190135530 |