EP4183787 - MORPHINAN COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.06.2024 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. 2 Independence Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2023/31] |
Former [2023/21] | For all designated states Concert Pharmaceuticals Inc. 99 Hayden Avenue, Suite 500 Lexington, MA 02421 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TUNG, Roger Lexington, 02420 / US | [2023/21] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/21] | Application number, filing date | 22199041.9 | 30.04.2008 | [2023/21] | Priority number, date | US200791513007P | 01.05.2007 Original published format: US 91513007 P | US200791666207P | 08.05.2007 Original published format: US 91666207 P | US200797604407P | 28.09.2007 Original published format: US 97604407 P | [2023/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4183787 | Date: | 24.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/08, C07B59/00, A61K31/439, A61P11/14 | [2023/21] | CPC: |
A61K31/195 (EP,US);
C12Q1/28 (US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,US);
A61K31/485 (EP,US);
A61K31/49 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/14 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
C07B59/002 (EP,US);
C07D221/28 (EP,US);
C07D471/08 (EP,US);
G01N33/491 (EP,US);
G01N33/493 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2023/21] | Title | German: | MORPHINANVERBINDUNGEN | [2023/21] | English: | MORPHINAN COMPOUNDS | [2023/21] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE MORPHINANE | [2023/21] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2022 | Examination requested [2023/21] | 13.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08747238.7 / EP2152709 | EP11000764.8 / EP2357183 | EP14173190.1 / EP2792662 | EP16163718.6 / EP3093290 | EP17206213.5 / EP3357923 | EP19201663.2 / EP3632916 | EP20200633.4 / EP3825306 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 17 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0141707 (UNIV VANDERBILT [US]) [A] 1-8* example 1; claim - *; | [A] - G. HEINKELE ET. AL., "Synthesis of [2H3]-dextromethorphan and its major urinary metabolites [2H3]-dextrorphan and [2H3]-dextrorphan-beta-glucoronide", JOURNAL OF LABELLED COMPOUNDS AND RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, (2002), vol. 45, pages 1153 - 1158, XP002490642 [A] 1-8 * whole article * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jlcr.640 | [A] - T.H. EICHHOLD ET. AL., "Highly sensitive high-peformance liquid chromatographic-tandem mass spectrometric method for the analysis of dextromorphan in human plasma.", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B, (1997), vol. 698, pages 147 - 154, XP002490644 [A] 1-8 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(97)00308-3 | [A] - G. HEINKELE ET. AL., "Synthesis of [2H]-labelled phase I metabolites using 1-[2H]-pyridinium hydrochloride.", JOURNAL OF LABELLED COMPOUNDS AND RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, (2005), vol. 48, pages 457 - 461, XP002490645 [A] 1-8 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jlcr.941 | [AP] - H. BÖLCSKEI ET. AL., "Synthesis of deuterated dextromethorphan derivatives.", ARKIVOK, (20080301), vol. 2008, no. iii, pages 182 - 193, XP002490643 [AP] 1-8 * page 183 - page 184; figure 1 * | by applicant | US4316888 | US4446140 | US4694010 | US4898860 | US5166207 | US5304121 | US5336980 | US5350756 | US5366980 | US5863927 | US5886026 | US6099562 | US6197830 | US6207164 | US2001044446 | US2002103109 | USRE38115E | US6583152 | US2004087479 | US6803031 | US2005129783 | US2005203125 | US7014866 | US2006079502 | US2006094744 | US7114547 | US2007191411 | - MILLER, SC et al., Addict Biol, (20050000), vol. 10, no. 4, pages 325 - 7 | - NICHOLSON, KL et al., Psychopharmacology (Berl, (19990901), vol. 146, no. 1, pages 49 - 59 | - PENDER, ES et al., Pediatr Emerg Care, (19910000), vol. 7, pages 163 - 7 | - ZAWERTAILO LA et al., J Clin Psychopharmacol, (19980800), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 332 - 7 | - GANES LZ et al., Comp Biochem Physiol A Mol Integr Physiol, (19980000), vol. 119, page 725 | - KIM HC et al., Bioorg Med Chem Lett, (20010000), vol. 11, page 1651 | - NEWMAN AH et al., J Med Chem, (19920000), vol. 35, page 4135 | - GANAPATHY MEPRASAD PDHUANG WSETH PLEIBACH FHGANAPATHY V, "Molecular and ligand-binding characterization of the s-receptor in the Jurkat human T lymphocyte cell line", J Pharmacol Exp Ther., (19990000), vol. 289, pages 251 - 260 | - GOLDMAN MEJACOBSON AERICE KCPAUL SM, "Differentiation of [.H] phencyclidine and (+)-[.H]SKF-10047 binding sites in rat cerebral cortex", FEBS Lett., (19850000), vol. 190, doi:10.1016/0014-5793(85)81313-2, pages 333 - 336, XP025604812 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(85)81313-2 | - FREIREICH et al., Cancer Chemother. Rep, (19660000), vol. 50, page 219 | - Scientific Tables, Geigy Pharmaceuticals, (19700000), page 537 | - SIEGEL BWSREEKRISHNA KBARON BM, "Binding of the radiolabeled glycine site antagonist [3H]MDS105,519 to homomeric NMDA-NRla receptors.", Eur J Pharmacol., (19960000), vol. 312, no. 3, pages 357 - 365 |