EP4344852 - APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING HOLLOW BODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEKUM Maschinenfabriken GmbH Kitzingerstraße 15/19 12277 Berlin / DE | [2024/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENNEMANN, Ullrich 3133 Traismauer / AT | 02 /
SCHARNER, Michael 3133 Traismauer / AT | [2024/14] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [2024/14] | Application number, filing date | 22199070.8 | 30.09.2022 | [2024/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4344852 | Date: | 03.04.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B29C49/56, // B29C49/04, B29L31/00 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
B29C49/56 (EP);
B29C49/5603 (EP);
B29C49/5605 (EP);
B29C49/5608 (EP);
B29C49/561 (EP);
B29C2049/5631 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON HOHLKÖRPERN | [2024/14] | English: | APPARATUS FOR MANUFACTURING HOLLOW BODIES | [2024/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION DE CORPS CREUX | [2024/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3559235 (HAGEN REINOLD) [X] 1,2 * abstract * [I] 11-14; | [XI]DE19516125 (BATTENFELD FISCHER BLASFORM [DE]) [X] 1,4,5 * abstract * [I] 11-14; | [A]EP1306193 (MAGIC MP SPA [IT]) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [XI]EP2583812 (HESTA BLASFORMTECHNIK GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * [I] 11-14 | by applicant | DE1814883 | EP1598165 | WO2018216361 |