EP4134930 - ELECTRICAL SAFETY DEVICE AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.01.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Connected Innovations Limited Chancery House 30 St Johns Road Woking, Surrey GU21 7SA / GB | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARFITT, Anthony D. Woking / GB | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 22199191.2 | 16.07.2019 | [2023/07] | Priority number, date | GB20180011648 | 16.07.2018 Original published format: GB 201811648 | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4134930 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G08B17/06, G08B17/12, // G08B21/18, G08B17/10 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
G08B17/06 (EP,GB);
H02H5/045 (GB,US);
G05B19/0428 (US);
G01J5/0096 (US);
G01J5/12 (US);
G01K13/00 (GB);
G08B17/10 (EP,GB);
G08B17/12 (GB);
G08B21/14 (GB);
G08B21/18 (GB);
G08B21/182 (US);
G08B21/185 (EP,GB,US);
G08C17/02 (US);
H01R13/7137 (US);
H02H1/0023 (GB);
H02H3/04 (GB);
G01J2005/123 (US);
G01K2207/00 (GB);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/38] |
Former [2023/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE SICHERHEITSVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM | [2023/07] | English: | ELECTRICAL SAFETY DEVICE AND SYSTEM | [2023/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE SÉCURITÉ ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/07] | Examination procedure | 15.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/38] | 15.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP19745731.0 / EP3824453 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2007120914 (KOPELMAN ROBERT Z [US]); | [I]CN105336127 (ZHANG QIN); | [I]CN106228762 (CHANGDE WEI DI ELECTRIC CO LTD) |