EP4349260 - PATIENT MONITOR COMPRISING ONE OR MORE UNIVERSAL PORTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.04.2024 [2024/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOYE, Neil Francis 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
VAN KESTEREN, Hans Willem 5656AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/15] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/15] | Application number, filing date | 22199458.5 | 04.10.2022 | [2024/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4349260 | Date: | 10.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/273, A61B5/30 | [2024/15] | CPC: |
A61B5/273 (EP);
A61B5/303 (EP);
A61B2562/222 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PATIENTENMONITOR MIT EINEM ODER MEHREREN UNIVERSELLEN PORTS | [2024/15] | English: | PATIENT MONITOR COMPRISING ONE OR MORE UNIVERSAL PORTS | [2024/15] | French: | MONITEUR DE PATIENT COMPRENANT UN OU PLUSIEURS ORIFICES UNIVERSELS | [2024/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005113704 (LAWSON COREY J [US], et al) [A] 1-13* paragraphs [0007] , [0022] , [0025] *; | [X]US2011209915 (TELFORT VALERY G [CA], et al) [X] 1,3-5,10,11 * paragraphs [0089] , [0116] , [0125] , [0176] , [0198] , [0206] * * figure 19 *; | [XI]WO2015009315 (DRAEGER MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-5,9-12 * page 2, lines 32-34 * * page 3, line 10 - page 4, line 3 * * page 7, lines 9-15 * * page 14, lines 14-29 * * page 15, lines 25-27 * * page 17, lines 4, 5, 21-34 * * page 18, lines 11-24 * * page 21, lines 6-8 * * figures 4B, 5 * [I] 6-8,13 |