EP4321799 - VEHICLE LAMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.08.2024 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.01.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coplus Inc. No.7, Xinping Road South District Tainan City / TW | [2024/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wu, Jacob Tainan City / TW | [2024/07] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/07] | Cabinet Chaillot 16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre B.P. 74 92703 Colombes Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 22199683.8 | 04.10.2022 | [2024/07] | Priority number, date | US202263397706P | 12.08.2022 Original published format: US 202263397706 P | [2024/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4321799 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F21S43/241, F21S43/31, F21S43/14, F21S43/239, F21S43/243, F21S43/247, F21S43/20, F21S43/27 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
F21S43/14 (EP);
F21K9/61 (CN);
F21S41/24 (US);
F21S41/143 (US);
F21S43/239 (EP);
F21S43/241 (EP);
F21S43/243 (EP);
F21S43/247 (EP);
F21S43/26 (EP);
F21S43/27 (EP);
F21S43/315 (EP);
F21V19/003 (CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/36] |
Former [2024/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGLEUCHTE | [2024/07] | English: | VEHICLE LAMP | [2024/07] | French: | LAMPE DE VÉHICULE | [2024/07] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2024 | Examination requested [2024/36] | 31.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.09.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102007019688 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]); | [YA]DE102009048032 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]); | [A]EP2372234 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]); | [A]JP2015207476 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [YA]US9651212 (WASILEWSKI ANDRZEJ [US], et al); | [YA]FR3054641 (VALEO ILUMINACION SA [ES]); | [Y]CN210153724U (CHINA FAW GROUP CORP); | [A]CN210591601U (CHINA FAW GROUP CORP); | [I]EP3671018 (FICOSA NORTH AMERICA CORP [US]) |