EP4163484 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE TORQUE OUTPUT OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE OF AN AUTOMOBILE WITH ASYMMETRIC CYCLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.03.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEW H POWERTRAIN HOLDING, S.L.U. Avenida de Madrid número 72 47008 Valladolid / ES | [2024/10] |
Former [2023/15] | For all designated states Renault s.a.s 122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guerout, Romain 91510 Lardy / FR | 02 /
Lefevre, Cedric 91510 Lardy / FR | 03 /
Pereira, Luc 91510 Lardy / FR | [2023/15] | Representative(s) | Renault Group Renault s.a.s. 1 avenue du Golf FR TCR AVA 055 78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 22199724.0 | 05.10.2022 | [2023/15] | Priority number, date | FR20210010598 | 06.10.2021 Original published format: FR 2110598 | [2023/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4163484 | Date: | 12.04.2023 | Language: | FR | [2023/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F02D13/02, F02D41/00, F02D41/22 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
F02D41/221 (EP);
F02D13/0234 (EP);
F02D13/0269 (EP);
F02D41/0002 (EP);
F02D2041/001 (EP);
F02D2041/227 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] |
Former [2023/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES VON EINEM VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS ABGEGEBENEN DREHMOMENTS MIT EINEM ASYMMETRISCHEN ZYKLUS | [2023/15] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE TORQUE OUTPUT OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE OF AN AUTOMOBILE WITH ASYMMETRIC CYCLE | [2023/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE DU COUPLE DÉLIVRÉ PAR UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE À CYCLE ASYMÉTRIQUE | [2023/15] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 05.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP3199786 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0032] *; | [A]DE102020112111 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0091] *; | [A]DE102019220402 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0018] * |