EP4135254 - CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION REPORT ON PHYSICAL UPLINK SHARED CHANNEL IN NEW RADIO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Apple Inc. One Apple Park Way Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2023/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIONG, Gang Portland, OR 97229 / US | 02 /
DAVYDOV, Alexei Nizhny Novgorod 603132 / RU | 03 /
HAN, Seunghee San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 04 /
ZHANG, Yushu Beijing 100190 / CN | 05 /
CHO, Joonyoung Portland, OR 97229 / US | [2023/07] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2023/07] | Application number, filing date | 22199779.4 | 10.09.2018 | [2023/07] | Priority number, date | US201762556966P | 11.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762556966 P | US201762570008P | 09.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762570008 P | [2023/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4135254 | Date: | 15.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04L1/16, H04W72/12, H04L1/18 | [2023/07] | CPC: |
H04W72/1268 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0055 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0012 (EP,US);
H04L1/1671 (EP,CN);
H04L1/1854 (EP,CN);
H04L5/0007 (EP,CN);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/07] | Title | German: | KANALSTATUSINFORMATIONSBERICHT AUF EINEM GEMEINSAM GENUTZTEN PHYSIKALISCHEN UPLINK-KANAL IN NEW RADIO | [2023/07] | English: | CHANNEL STATE INFORMATION REPORT ON PHYSICAL UPLINK SHARED CHANNEL IN NEW RADIO | [2023/07] | French: | RAPPORT D'INFORMATIONS D'ÉTAT DE CANAL SUR UN CANAL PARTAGÉ DE LIAISON MONTANTE PHYSIQUE DANS UNE NOUVELLE RADIO | [2023/07] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2022 | Examination requested [2023/07] | 03.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18854440.7 / EP3682588 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |