EP4173459 - HYDRAULIC SYSTEM FOR AN AGRICULTURAL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2024 [2024/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Billich, Manuel Mannheim / DE | 02 /
Meid, Michael Mannheim / DE | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Dehnhardt, Florian Christopher John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Straße 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 22200579.5 | 10.10.2022 | [2023/18] | Priority number, date | DE202110128264 | 29.10.2021 Original published format: DE102021128264 | [2023/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4173459 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01B63/108, A01B63/32, F15B11/00 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
A01B63/108 (EP);
A01B63/10 (EP);
F15B13/07 (EP);
F15B13/10 (EP);
F15B20/00 (EP);
F15B21/003 (EP);
F15B2211/30565 (EP);
F15B2211/3058 (EP);
F15B2211/30595 (EP);
F15B2211/31541 (EP);
F15B2211/31588 (EP);
F15B2211/324 (EP);
F15B2211/329 (EP);
F15B2211/40515 (EP);
F15B2211/40584 (EP);
F15B2211/41527 (EP);
F15B2211/7052 (EP);
F15B2211/7053 (EP);
F15B2211/7142 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] |
Former [2023/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRAULIKSYSTEM FÜR EIN LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHES FAHRZEUG | [2023/18] | English: | HYDRAULIC SYSTEM FOR AN AGRICULTURAL VEHICLE | [2023/18] | French: | SYSTÈME HYDRAULIQUE POUR VÉHICULE AGRICOLE | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 03.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/14] | 24.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2024/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE3214206 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [X] 1,7 * page 4, line 1 - page 12, line 20 * * figure 1 * [Y] 8-11; | [X]DE102005003065 (GUENTER TILL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] - [0018] * * figure 1 *; | [YA]DE202006005478U (MISCHLER REINER [DE], et al) [Y] 2-6 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] * * claim 1 * * figure 1 * [A] 1,7-11; | [YA]DE202011001727U (HANS SAUTER GMBH LANDTECHNIK STAHLBAU [DE]) [Y] 8-11 * paragraphs [0001] - [0021] *[A] 1-7; | [XY]EP3236085 (CLAAS INDUSTRIETECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0001] - [0049] * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 2-6 |