EP4174641 - METHOD FOR GENERATING PROGRAM CODE, METHOD FOR CONFIGURING A CONTROL DEVICE AND COMPUTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states dSPACE GmbH Rathenaustraße 26 33102 Paderborn / DE | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mair, Michael 33102 Paderborn / DE | 02 /
Wallbaum, Lars 33102 Paderborn / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 22201338.5 | 13.10.2022 | [2023/18] | Priority number, date | DE202110128101 | 28.10.2021 Original published format: DE102021128101 | [2023/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174641 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06F8/34, G06F8/36, G06F8/41 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
G06F8/423 (EP);
G05B19/05 (CN);
G06F8/30 (US);
G06F8/34 (EP);
G06F8/36 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] |
Former [2023/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN VON PROGRAMMCODE, VERFAHREN ZUM KONFIGURIEREN EINES STEUERGERÄTS UND COMPUTERSYSTEM | [2023/18] | English: | METHOD FOR GENERATING PROGRAM CODE, METHOD FOR CONFIGURING A CONTROL DEVICE AND COMPUTER SYSTEM | [2023/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE GÉNÉRATION DE CODE DE PROGRAMME, PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION D'UN APPAREIL DE COMMANDE ET SYSTÈME INFORMATIQUE | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 03.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US8839187 (YAN YING-ON [US]); | by applicant | DE102020124080 |