EP4354486 - ELECTRON-OPTICAL ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2024/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KONING, Johan, Joost 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 02 /
DEL TIN, Laura 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2024/16] | Representative(s) | ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2024/16] | Application number, filing date | 22201402.9 | 13.10.2022 | [2024/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4354486 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/24, H01J37/244 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
H01J37/24 (EP);
H01J37/244 (EP);
H01J2237/0437 (EP);
H01J2237/1202 (EP);
H01J2237/1504 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRONENOPTISCHES ELEMENT | [2024/16] | English: | ELECTRON-OPTICAL ELEMENT | [2024/16] | French: | ELÉMENT OPTIQUE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2024/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2251893 (IMS NANOFABRICATION AG [AT]) [A] 1-15; | [A]WO2015090377 (MAPPER LITHOGRAPHY IP BV [NL]) [A] 1-15; | [A]US2016141142 (MATSUMOTO HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-15; | [A]EP3869533 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV [NL])[A] 1-15 | by applicant | EP2425444 | EP20200158804 | EP20200158732 | EP20200184161 |