EP4152089 - DEVICE FOR DRIVING LENS, AND CAMERA MODULE AND OPTICAL INSTRUMENT COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 29.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant | 29.12.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] | 29.12.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 31.01.2024 [2024/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 30, Magokjungang 10-ro Gangseo-gu Seoul 07796 / KR | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Sang Ok 07796 Seoul / KR | 02 /
MIN, Sang Jun 07796 Seoul / KR | 03 /
SON, Byung Wook 07796 Seoul / KR | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | M. Zardi & Co S.A. Via G. B. Pioda, 6 6900 Lugano / CH | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 22201558.8 | 26.09.2017 | [2023/12] | Priority number, date | KR20160126652 | 30.09.2016 Original published format: KR 20160126652 | KR20160126653 | 30.09.2016 Original published format: KR 20160126653 | KR20160131103 | 11.10.2016 Original published format: KR 20160131103 | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4152089 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP4152089 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G03B3/10, G02B7/02, G02B7/04, H02K41/035, G03B13/32, G03B5/00, H04N23/55, H04N23/57, G02B27/64, G02B7/08 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
H02K41/0356 (EP);
G02B7/09 (CN,US);
G02B27/646 (EP,US);
G02B7/028 (EP);
G02B7/08 (EP,US);
G02B7/28 (CN);
G03B13/36 (CN,US);
G03B3/10 (CN);
G03B30/00 (CN);
G03B5/00 (EP,CN,US);
H02K33/18 (CN);
H02K41/035 (EP);
H04N23/55 (EP,US);
H04N23/57 (EP);
G03B2205/0007 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/05] |
Former [2023/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANTREIBEN EINER LINSE UND KAMERAMODUL UND OPTISCHES INSTRUMENT DAMIT | [2023/12] | English: | DEVICE FOR DRIVING LENS, AND CAMERA MODULE AND OPTICAL INSTRUMENT COMPRISING SAME | [2023/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE LENTILLE, ET MODULE DE CAMÉRA ET INSTRUMENT OPTIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2023/12] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/05] | 28.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP17856695.6 / EP3521922 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2015309282 (LEE JUN TAEK [KR], et al); | [A]KR20150128264 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]) |