EP4203417 - SYSTEMS, METHODS, ARTICLES OF MANUFACTURE, AND APPARATUS FOR END-TO-END HARDWARE TRACING IN AN EDGE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUMAR, Karthik Chandler, AZ, 85249 / US | 02 /
CHERUVU, Sunil Tempe, AZ, 85284 / US | 03 /
GOHAD, Tushar Phoenix, AZ, 85044 / US | 04 /
SMITH, Ned M. Beaverton, OR, 97006 / US | 05 /
GUIM BERNAT, Francesc 08036 Barcelona / ES | [2023/26] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 22201735.2 | 14.10.2022 | [2023/26] | Priority number, date | US202117561516 | 23.12.2021 Original published format: US202117561516 | [2023/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4203417 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L43/026, H04L43/04, H04L43/106 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
G06F11/302 (EP);
G06F11/3636 (US);
G06F11/3006 (EP);
G06F11/3476 (EP);
G06F11/3495 (EP);
G06F11/3664 (US);
H04L43/026 (EP);
H04L43/04 (EP);
H04L43/106 (EP);
G06F2201/865 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] |
Former [2023/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME, VERFAHREN, HERSTELLUNGSARTIKEL UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR END-TO-END-HARDWAREVERFOLGUNG IN EINEM EDGE-NETZWERK | [2023/26] | English: | SYSTEMS, METHODS, ARTICLES OF MANUFACTURE, AND APPARATUS FOR END-TO-END HARDWARE TRACING IN AN EDGE NETWORK | [2023/26] | French: | SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS, ARTICLES DE FABRICATION ET APPAREIL POUR LE TRAÇAGE DE MATÉRIEL DE BOUT EN BOUT DANS UN RÉSEAU PÉRIPHÉRIQUE | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 29.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2020162589 (VIJAYADHARAN SAJAY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0014] , [0155] - [0169]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2021117249 (DOSHI KSHITIJ A [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0095] - [0105] - [0196] - [0293]; figure -; claim - *; | [A] - SALMAN TAHERIZADEH ET AL, "Monitoring self-adaptive applications within edge computing frameworks: A state-of-the-art review", JOURNAL OF SYSTEMS & SOFTWARE, US, (20180201), vol. 136, doi:10.1016/j.jss.2017.10.033, ISSN 0164-1212, pages 19 - 38, XP055679388 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jss.2017.10.033 |