EP4357579 - SPACER OUTLET DISTANCE CONTROL DURING VIG UNIT MANUFACTURING BY MEANS OF A DISTANCE CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VKR Holding A/S Breeltevej 18 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSEN, Simon 2970 Hørsholm / DK | 02 /
JENSEN, Henrik Aslak 2970 Hørsholm / DK | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 22202423.4 | 19.10.2022 | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4357579 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/677, E06B3/663, E06B3/66, E06B3/673 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
E06B3/6612 (EP);
E06B3/66304 (EP);
E06B3/67326 (EP);
E06B3/67365 (EP);
E06B3/67369 (EP);
E06B2003/67395 (EP);
E06B3/6775 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABSTANDSREGELUNG BEI DER VIG-EINHEITSHERSTELLUNG MITTELS EINES ABSTANDSREGLERS | [2024/17] | English: | SPACER OUTLET DISTANCE CONTROL DURING VIG UNIT MANUFACTURING BY MEANS OF A DISTANCE CONTROLLER | [2024/17] | French: | COMMANDE DE DISTANCE DE SORTIE D'ÉLÉMENT D'ESPACEMENT PENDANT LA FABRICATION D'UNE UNITÉ VIG AU MOYEN D'UN DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE DISTANCE | [2024/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]CN203668211U (LUOYANG LANDGLASS TECH CO LTD) | by applicant | CN205258287U | CN106045286 | WO2019218901 | WO2021208628 | US11396477 |