EP4357612 - TRANSPORTATION SYSTEM FOR COMPONENTS FOR AT LEAST ONE WIND TURBINE, ADAPTER ELEMENT, KIT AND METHOD FOR BUILDING UP A TRANSPORTATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nordex Energy SE & Co. KG Langenhorner Chaussee 600 22419 Hamburg / DE | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wackrow, Torsten 22419 Hamburg / DE | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 22202694.0 | 20.10.2022 | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4357612 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F03D13/40 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
F03D13/401 (EP);
F03D13/402 (EP);
F05B2260/02 (EP);
F05B2260/30 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSPORTSYSTEM FÜR BAUTEILE FÜR MINDESTENS EINE WINDENERGIEANLAGE, ADAPTERELEMENT, KIT UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBAU EINES TRANSPORTSYSTEMS | [2024/17] | English: | TRANSPORTATION SYSTEM FOR COMPONENTS FOR AT LEAST ONE WIND TURBINE, ADAPTER ELEMENT, KIT AND METHOD FOR BUILDING UP A TRANSPORTATION SYSTEM | [2024/17] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT POUR COMPOSANTS D'AU MOINS UNE ÉOLIENNE, ÉLÉMENT ADAPTATEUR, KIT ET PROCÉDÉ DE CONSTRUCTION D'UN SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT | [2024/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012043250 (NOGUEIRA FABIO FARANI [BR], et al) [A] 1,2,5-8,10,13-15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0014] - [0018] * * figures 1,2,3 *; | [A]US2013216325 (JOHNSON STEPHEN BERTRAM [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0027] - [0031] - [0047] , [0048] * * figures 2,3,4 *; | [A]JP2019505716 (VESTAS WIND SYSTEMS A/S) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0023] , [0 24] , [0 25] , [0 27] , [0 35] , [0 36] ** figures 1-4 *; | [X]EP4060188 (NORDEX ENERGY SE & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3,6-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0005] - [0012] - [0015] , [0 17] , [0 19] , [0020] , [0029] , [0035] , [0041] , [0045] * * figures 2,3,4,5,7,9,12 * |