EP4356928 - NUCLEOSIDE DIPHOSPHATE OR DIPHOSPHONATE PRODRUGS, OR NUCLEOSIDE ANALOGUE DIPHOSPHATE OR DIPHOSPHONATE PRODRUGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universität Hamburg Mittelweg 177 20148 Hamburg / DE | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meier, Chris 21635 Jork / DE | 02 /
Jia, Xiao 20146 Hamburg / DE | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Stüven, Ralf RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Kirchenhang 32b 21073 Hamburg / DE | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 22202808.6 | 20.10.2022 | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4356928 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/54, A61P31/12 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61K47/548 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NUKLEOSID-DIPHOSPHAT- ODER DIPHOSPHONAT-PRODRUGS ODER NUKLEOSID-ANALOG-DIPHOSPHAT- ODER DIPHOSPHONAT-PRODRUGS | [2024/17] | English: | NUCLEOSIDE DIPHOSPHATE OR DIPHOSPHONATE PRODRUGS, OR NUCLEOSIDE ANALOGUE DIPHOSPHATE OR DIPHOSPHONATE PRODRUGS | [2024/17] | French: | PROMÉDICAMENTS DE NUCLÉOSIDE DIPHOSPHATE OU DIPHOSPHONATE, OU PROMÉDICAMENTS DE NUCLÉOSIDE ANALOGUE DIPHOSPHATE OU DIPHOSPHONATE | [2024/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDY]WO2016026493 (UNIVERSITÄT HAMBURG [DE]) [XD] 1-6,8,9,11-14 * pages 29-30; claims 4, 5, 6 * [Y] 7,10; | [XY] - WEINSCHENK LINA ET AL, "Nucleoside Diphosphate Prodrugs: Nonsymmetric Di PP ro-Nucleotides", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, US, vol. 58, no. 15, doi:10.1021/acs.jmedchem.5b00737, ISSN 0022-2623, (20150722), pages 6114 - 6130, URL: https://pubs.acs.org/doi/pdf/10.1021/acs.jmedchem.5b00737, XP093036564 [X] 1-6,8,9,11-14 * Abstract, figure 1 * [Y] 7,10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jmedchem.5b00737 | [X] - HOSTETLER K Y ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND ANTIRETROVIRAL ACTIVITY OF PHOSPHOLIPID ANALOGS OF AZIDOTHYMIDINE AND OTHER ANTIVIRAL NUCLEOSIDES", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, (19900415), vol. 265, no. 11, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 6112 - 6117, XP000371928 [X] 1,9,11-14 * figure 1, page 6113, left column, 2nd and 3rd paragraph * | [Y] - Jia Xiao, "Membrane-Permeable Nucleoside Triphosphate Prodrugs of Anti-HIV Active Nucleoside Analogues: gamma-(Phosphate or Phosphonate)-Modified Nucleotide Analogues", (20200101), URL: https://ediss.sub.uni-hamburg.de/handle/ediss/8566, (20230331), XP093036542 [Y] 7,10 * pages 92-99 and scheme 31, figure 22, table 5, pages 260, structures 70a-c and 71a-d * | [Y] - Jia Xiao, "Membrane-Permeable Nucleoside Triphosphate Prodrugs of Anti-HIV Active Nucleoside Analogues: [gamma]-(Phosphate or Phosphonate)-Modified Nucleotide Analogues", (20200101), URL: https://ediss.sub.uni-hamburg.de/handle/ediss/8566, (20230331), XP093036546 [Y] 7,10 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO2009129798 | WO2016026493 | WO2018100137 | - BALZARINI, P. HERDEWIJNE. DE CLERCQ, "Differential Patterns of intracellular Metabolism of 2',3'-Didehydro-2',3'-dideoxythymidine and 3'-Azido-2',3'-dideoxythymidine, two potent Anti-human Immunodeficiency Virus Compounds", J. Biol. Chem., (19890000), vol. 264, pages 6127 - 6133 | - RJ SAWCHUKZ. YANG, "Investigation of distribution, transport and uptake of anti-HIV drugs to the central nervous system", Advanced Drug Delivery Reviews, (19990000), vol. 39, pages 5 - 31 | - A. POMPONI. LEFEBVREJ.-L. IMBACHS. KHAND. FARQUHAR, "Decomposition Pathways of the Mono-(Pivaloyloxymethyl) and Bis-(Pivaloyloxymethyl) Esters of Azidothymidine- 5'-Monophosphate in Cell Extract and in Tissue-Culture Medium - An Application of the Online ISRP-Cleaning HPLC Technique", Antiviral Chem. Chemother, (19940000), vol. 5, pages 91 - 98 | - I. LEFEBVREC. PERIGAUDA. POMPONA.-M. AUBERTINJ.-L. GIRARDETA. KIMG. GOSSELINJ.-L. IMBACH, "Mononucleoside Phosphotriester Derivates with S Acyl-2-thioethyl Bioreversible Phosphate-Protecting Groups: Intracellular Delivery of 3'-Azido-2',3'-dideoxythymidine-5'-monophosphate", J. Med. Chem., (19950000), vol. 38, doi:10.1021/jm00020a007, pages 3941 - 3950, XP002293734 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00020a007 | - W. THOMSOND. NICHOLLSW. J. IRWINJ. S. AL-MUSHADANIS. FREEMANA. KARPASJ.PETRIKN. MAHMOODA. J. HAY, "Synthesis, Bioactivation and Anti-HIV Activity of the Bis(4-acyloxybenzyl) and Mono(4-acyloxybenzyl) Esters of the 5'-Monophosphate of AZT", J. Chem. Soc., Perkin Trans, (19930000), vol. 1, pages 1239 - 1245, XP009120657 | - A. ROUTLEDGEI. WALKERS. FREEMANA. HAYN. MAHMOOD, "Synthesis, Bioactivation and Anti-HIV Activity of 4-Acyloxybenzyl Bis(Nucleosid-5-yl) Phosphates", Nucl. Nucl., (19950000), vol. 14, doi:10.1080/15257779508009491, pages 1545 - 1558, XP009120656 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/15257779508009491 | - C. MEIER, "Cyc/oSal Phosphates as Chemical trojan Horses for the intracellular Nucleotide and Glycosylmonophosphate Delivery - Chemistry meets Biology", Eur. J. Org. Chem., (20060000), pages 1081 - 1102 | - JESSEN HJSCHULZ TBALZARINI JMEIER C, "Bioreversible protection of nucleoside diphosphates", Angew. Chem., (20080000), vol. 47, no. 45, doi:10.1002/anie.200803100, pages 8719 - 22, XP002538710 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200803100 | - T. GOLLNESTT. DINIS DE OLIVEIRAA. RATHI. HAUBERD. SCHOLSJ. BALZARINIC. MEIER, "Membrane-permeable Triphosphate Prodrugs of Nucleoside Analogues", Angew. Chem., (20160000), vol. 55, doi:10.1002/anie.201511808, page 5255, XP055396608 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.201511808 | - MEIER C, "Nucleoside diphosphate and triphosphate prodrugs - An unsolvable task?", Antiviral Chem. Chemother, (20171200), vol. 25, no. 3, doi:10.1177/2040206617738656, pages 69 - 82, XP055458335 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/2040206617738656 | - JIA XSCHOLS DMEIER C, "Lipophilic Triphosphate Prodrugs of Various Nucleoside Analogues", J. Med. Chem., (20200709), vol. 63, no. 13, doi:10.1021/acs.jmedchem.0c00358, pages 6991 - 7007, XP055888348 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.jmedchem.0c00358 | - JIA XSCHOLS DMEIER C, "Anti-HIV-Active Nucleoside Triphosphate Prodrugs", J. Med. Chem., (20200611), vol. 63, no. 11, pages 6003 - 6027 | - ZHAO CJIA XSCHOLS DBALZARINI JMEIER C, "γ-Non-Symmetrically Dimasked TriPPPro Prodrugs as Potential Antiviral Agents against HIV", ChemMedChem, (20210204), vol. 16, no. 3, pages 499 - 512 | - JIA XGANTER BMEIER C, "Improving properties of the nucleobase analogs T-705/T-1105 as potential antiviral", Annu. Rep. Med. Chem., (20210000), vol. 57, pages 1 - 47 | - C. ZHAOS. WEBERD. SCHOLSJ. BALZARINIC. MEIER, "Prodrugs of γ-Alkyl-Modified Nucleoside Triphosphates: Improved Inhibition of HIV Reverse Transcriptase", Angew. Chem., (20200000), vol. 59, pages 22063 - 22071 | - JIA XWEBER SSCHOLS DMEIER C, J. Med. Chem., (20200000), vol. 63, no. 20, pages 11990 - 12007 |