EP4173868 - STEERING CONTROL DEVICE, VEHICLE POWER SOURCE SYSTEM, AND VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 03.11.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | 03.11.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 06.12.2023 [2023/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT CORPORATION 1-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi Aichi-ken, 448-8652 / JP | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOUDAI, Takashi Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8652 / JP | 02 /
FUJITA, Yuji Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8652 / JP | 03 /
NAGASHIMA, Yugo Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8652 / JP | 04 /
KAJISAWA, Yuuta Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8652 / JP | 05 /
HASEGAWA, Kazuma Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8652 / JP | 06 /
YAMASHITA, Yosuke Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | 07 /
TAKAYAMA, Shintaro Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 22202947.2 | 21.10.2022 | [2023/18] | Priority number, date | JP20210174722 | 26.10.2021 Original published format: JP 2021174722 | [2023/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4173868 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60K28/10, H02J7/34, H02J9/00, H02J1/08, B62D5/04, B60W50/035, B60W50/14, B60W50/12, F16H61/22 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
B60K28/10 (EP);
B62D5/0463 (US);
B60W50/035 (EP);
B60W50/14 (EP);
B62D5/0481 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0292 (EP);
B60W2510/244 (EP);
B60W2540/06 (EP);
B62D5/046 (EP);
B62D5/0475 (EP);
F16H59/58 (EP);
F16H61/22 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] |
Former [2023/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LENKSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, FAHRZEUGSTROMVERSORGUNGSSYSTEM UND FAHRZEUG | [2023/18] | English: | STEERING CONTROL DEVICE, VEHICLE POWER SOURCE SYSTEM, AND VEHICLE | [2023/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONTRÔLE DE DIRECTION, SYSTÈME D'ALIMENTATION DE VÉHICULE ET VÉHICULE | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 30.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 30.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6007451 (MATSUI HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,4,6* column 7, line 17 - column 8, line 62; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2018123473 (AUTONETWORKS TECHNOLOGIES LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0043]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP3705376 (JTEKT CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0047]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | JP2018103731 |