EP4186365 - PLANT PROTECTION METHOD AGAINST THE PLANTHOPPER PENTASTIRIDIUS LEPORINUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 28.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | For all designated states AgPrime GmbH Arnold-Sommerfeld-Ring 2 52499 Baesweiler / DE | [2023/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Kwang-Zin 35392 Giessen / DE | 02 /
Vilcinskas, Andreas 35392 Giessen / DE | 03 /
Beckers, Gerold JM 52499 Baesweiler / DE | [2023/22] | Representative(s) | Roth, Andy Stefan Dr. Roth Patentanwaltskanzlei Plange Mühle 5 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/22] | Roth, Andy Stefan Dr. Roth Patentanwaltskanzlei Kaistrasse 5 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 22203288.0 | 24.10.2022 | [2023/22] | Priority number, date | DE202110131251 | 29.11.2021 Original published format: DE102021131251 | [2023/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4186365 | Date: | 31.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01N35/06, A01P17/00 | [2023/22] | CPC: |
A01N35/06 (EP);
A01P17/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] |
Former [2023/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PFLANZENSCHUTZVERFAHREN GEGEN DIE SCHILF-GLASFLÜGELZIKADE PENTASTIRIDIUS LEPORINUS | [2023/22] | English: | PLANT PROTECTION METHOD AGAINST THE PLANTHOPPER PENTASTIRIDIUS LEPORINUS | [2023/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PROTECTION DES PLANTES CONTRE LES FULGORES DE L'ESPÈCE PENTASTIRIDIUS LEPORINUS | [2023/22] | Examination procedure | 14.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 14.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2017162887 (EVOLVA SA [CH]) [Y] 1-4,8-11 * paragraphs [0016] , [ 0025] * * figures 1-3, 5, 6 * * claims 1, 16 *; | [Y] - MAO LIXIN ET AL, "Evaluation of potential use of nootkatone against maize weevil (Sitophilus zeamais Motschulsky) and rice weevil [S. oryzae (L.)](Coleoptera: Curculionidae)", JOURNAL OF STORED PRODUCTS RESEARCH., GB, vol. 46, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.jspr.2010.01.002, ISSN 0022-474X, (20100401), pages 129 - 132, URL: https://reader.elsevier.com/reader/sd/pii/S0022474X10000226, XP093032505 [Y] 1-4,8-11 * abstract * * Abschnitt 3 * * tables 1, 2 * * figures 2, 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jspr.2010.01.002 | [Y] - Ibrahim Sanaa A ET AL, "Toxicity and Behavioral Effects of Nootkatone, 1,10-Dihydronootkatone, and Tetrahydronootkatone to the Formosan Subterranean Termite (Isoptera: Rhinotermitidae)", Journal of Economic Entomology, doi:10.1093/jee/97.1.102, (20040201), pages 102 - 111, URL: https://academic.oup.com/jee/article/97/1/102/2217939, (20230317), XP093032507 [Y] 1-4,8-11 * abstract * * page 105, column 1, line 31 - line 38 * * page 106, column 1, line 3 - line 13 * * page 107, column 2, line 55 - line 60 * * tables 1, 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/jee/97.1.102 | [Y] - ANDERSON J A ET AL, "Acetylcholinesterase inhibition by nootkatone and carvacrol in arthropods", PESTICIDE BIOCHEMISTRY AND PHYSIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, US, vol. 102, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.PESTBP.2011.12.002, ISSN 0048-3575, (20111218), pages 124 - 128, (20120113), XP028459192 [Y] 1-4,8-11 * abstract * * page 124, column 1, line 16 - line 20 * * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.pestbp.2011.12.002 | [Y] - ., "Kleine Schilf-Glasflügelzikade überträgt neue Rübenkrankheit", IVA-Magazin, Germany, (20130510), page 1, URL: https://www.iva.de/iva-magazin/umwelt-verbraucher/kleine-schilf-glasfluegelzikade-uebertraegt-neue-ruebenkrankheit, (20230317), XP093032557 [Y] 1-4,8-11 * the whole document * | [Y] - ., "Syndrome Basses Richesses - SBR", Agroscope Merkblatt Nr. 97, Schweiz, (20190101), pages 1 - 2, URL: https://www.zuckerruebe.ch/fileadmin/pdf/2021/Merkblatt_SBR.pdf, (20230317), XP093032561 [Y] 1-4,8-11 * the whole document * | [Y] - Schwabe Kristin, "Schädlingskontrolle im Zuckerrübenanbau: Worauf müssen wir uns einstellen?", Fachveranstaltung Pflanzenschutz in Ackerbau 2019, Germany, (20190124), pages 1 - 43, URL: https://www.isip.de/isip/servlet/resource/blob/286968/2cc449a124d2aeaec6bca05d7a43db39/schwabe--fs-ab-2019-data.pdf, (20230317), XP093032587 [Y] 1-4,8-11 * page 15 - page 29 * | by applicant | US4693905 | US4973485 | US5260086 | US5847226 | EP1083233 | WO0250053 | US6495193 | US2003185956 | US2003203090 | US6897244 | US7112700 | - Chemie in unserer Zeit, (20030000), vol. 37, no. 2, pages 88 - 97 | - HALLMANN, C.A et al., "More than 75 percent decline over 27 years in total flying insect biomass in protected areas", PLoS One, (20170000), vol. 12, no. 10, page e0185809 | - B. ADCOCK et al., J. Org. Chem., (19820000), vol. 47, page 2951 | - STEVENS et al., J. Sci. Fd. Agric., (19700000), vol. 21, pages 590 - 593 | - ZHU et al., J. Chem. Ecol., (20030000), vol. 29, pages 2695 - 2701 | - GIRHARD et al., Microb. Cell. Fact., (20090000), vol. 8, page 36 | - FRAATZ et al., Appl Microbiol Biotechnol., (20090000), vol. 83, no. 1, pages 35 - 41 | - FURUSAWA et al., Chem Pharm. Bull., (20050000), vol. 53, pages 1513 - 1514 | - SALVADOR et al., Green Chemistry, (20020000), vol. 4, pages 352 - 356 | - HUNTER et al., J. Food Sci, (19650000), vol. 30, page 876 | - WILSON et al., J. Agric. Food Chem., (19780000), vol. 26, page 1430 | - SALVADOR et al., Tetrahedron Lett., (19970000), vol. 38, pages 119 - 122 | - SALVADOR, Green Chem., (20020000), vol. 4, pages 352 - 356 | - HUNTER et al., "Conversion of valencene to nootkatone", J Food Sci, (19650000), vol. 30, pages 876 - 878 | - PESARO et al., "The total synthesis ofracemic nootkatone", Chem Commun, (19680000), vol. 19, pages 1152 - 1154 |