EP4177153 - MARINE PROPULSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamaha Hatsudoki Kabushiki Kaisha 2500, Shingai Iwata-shi, Shizuoka-ken 438-8501 / JP | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEGAYA, Yuji Iwata-shi, 438-8501 / JP | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 22203444.9 | 25.10.2022 | [2023/19] | Priority number, date | JP20210180208 | 04.11.2021 Original published format: JP 2021180208 | [2023/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4177153 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4177153 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B63H20/00, B63H25/42 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
B63H25/42 (EP,US);
B63H20/007 (EP);
B63H25/04 (US);
B63H2020/003 (EP,US);
B63H2021/205 (EP,US);
B63H2021/216 (EP);
B63H2025/045 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] |
Former [2023/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SCHIFFSANTRIEBSSYSTEM | [2023/19] | English: | MARINE PROPULSION SYSTEM | [2023/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PROPULSION MARINE | [2023/19] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 09.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US5931110 (YAMAMOTO SHIGERU [JP]); | [A]US2009107382 (HUNTT ROBERT [US]); | [Y]US2019179318 (MILLER ALBERT F [US], et al); | [YA]US2021139123 (OSARA TATSURO [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2000168692 |