EP4201760 - METHOD FOR OPERATING A BRAKE SYSTEM OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, CONTROL DEVICE, AND MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.05.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 05.01.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | 05.01.2024 | Change - designated states | published on 07.02.2024 [2024/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2023/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmalbruch, Michael 38302 Wolfenbüttel / DE | [2023/26] | Application number, filing date | 22203565.1 | 25.10.2022 | [2023/26] | Priority number, date | DE202110214849 | 21.12.2021 Original published format: DE102021214849 | [2023/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4201760 | Date: | 28.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60T1/10, B60T8/40 | [2023/26] | CPC: |
B60T1/10 (EP);
B60T8/17 (CN);
B60T8/172 (US);
B60L7/10 (CN);
B60T13/66 (CN);
B60T17/221 (US);
B60T8/171 (CN);
B60T8/4072 (EP);
B60T2201/124 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] |
Former [2023/26] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES BREMSSYSTEMS EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS, STEUEREINRICHTUNG SOWIE KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2023/26] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING A BRAKE SYSTEM OF A MOTOR VEHICLE, CONTROL DEVICE, AND MOTOR VEHICLE | [2023/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE D'UN VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE, DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE ET VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2023/26] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 02.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102011103660 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 10,11 * paragraphs [0012] , [0025] , [0026] *; | [Y]DE102013224143 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 7 * paragraphs [0037] , [0058] , [0075] *; | [Y]DE102016007436 (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 2,11* paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0020] *; | [Y]DE102016217680 (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 3,5 * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] , [0008] , [0009] , [0017] *; | [XY]WO2018177785 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,8,10 * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 11, paragraph 2 - page 12, paragraph 2 * * page 14, paragraph 6 - page 15, paragraph 1 * * page 17, paragraph 2 - page 19, paragraph 2 * [Y] 4,6,10,11; | [Y]DE102017207474 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [Y] 6 * paragraphs [0012] - [0014] - [0024] *; | [XY]WO2019197084 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,11 * page 3, line 13 - page 5, line 6 * * page 8, line 3 - line 5 * * page 11, line 12 - page 14, line 3 * [Y] 3-7,10; | [Y]DE102018209311 (AUDI AG [DE]) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0018] , [0054] *; | [IY]US2020079219 (OKUBO SHUNSUKE [US], et al) [I] 1,6,7 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023] * * figure 5 * * claims 4,5 * [Y] 2-5,8,10,11; | [X]DE102020204345 (CONTINENTAL TEVES AG & CO OHG [DE]) [X] 1,9,10 * paragraphs [0008] , [0015] , [0017] , [0018] , [0045] , [0046] , [0050] * | by applicant | US2010276240 |