EP4151627 - COMPOUNDS FOR TREATING HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PTC Therapeutics, Inc. 100 Corporate Court South Plainfield, NJ 07080 / US | [2023/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOLL, Matthew Dunellen, 08812 / US | 02 /
AMEDZO, Lukiana Somerset, 08873 / US | 03 /
BABU, Suresh Pennington, 08534 / US | 04 /
BARRAZA, Scott Piscataway, 08854 / US | 05 /
BHATTACHARYYA, Anuradha Edison, 08820 / US | 06 /
KARP, Gary Princeton Junction, 08550 / US | 07 /
MAZZOTTI, Anthony Rahway, 07065 / US | 08 /
NARASIMHAN, Jana Scotch Plains, 07076 / US | 09 /
PATEL, Jigar Edison, 08820 / US | 10 /
TURPOFF, Anthony Hillsborough, 08844 / US | 11 /
XU, Zhenrong Chalfont, 18914 / US | [2023/12] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2023/12] | Application number, filing date | 22203869.7 | 05.06.2018 | [2023/12] | Priority number, date | US201762514999P | 05.06.2017 Original published format: US 201762514999 P | [2023/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4151627 | Date: | 22.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D239/74, C07D239/94, C07D239/95, A61P25/14, A61K31/4709, A61K31/4725 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
C07D401/14 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/4709 (KR);
A61K31/5025 (KR);
A61P25/14 (EP,KR);
C07D413/14 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
C07D471/08 (EP,EA,IL,KR);
C07D491/048 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
C07D498/04 (EP,EA,IL,US);
C07D513/04 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
C07D519/00 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] |
Former [2023/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MORBUS HUNTINGTON | [2023/12] | English: | COMPOUNDS FOR TREATING HUNTINGTON'S DISEASE | [2023/12] | French: | COMPOSÉS PERMETTANT DE TRAITER LA MALADIE DE HUNTINGTON | [2023/12] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | 18.09.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP18813494.4 / EP3634953 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2005012288 (GENELABS TECH INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2005019215 (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US], et al); | [XA]JP2006219453 (TOKYO UNIV OF PHARMACY & LIFE); | [XA]WO2008011109 (AMGEN INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2012104823 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | by applicant | WO2016US66042 |