EP4173693 - CATALYSTS FOR GASOLINE EXHAUST GAS TREATMENTS WITH IMPROVED AMMONIA EMISSION CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company 5th Floor 25 Farringdon Street London EC4A 4AB / GB | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANDLER, Guy Richard Royston, SG8 5HE / GB | 02 /
CONTE, Sean Sakura-shi, 329-1412 / JP | 03 /
HOWARD, Michael Wayne, 19087 / US | 04 /
NAGAOKA, Shuhei Sakura-shi, 329-1412 / JP | 05 /
POWELL, Alexis Royston, SG8 5HE / GB | 06 /
ZHANG, Xiaorui Sakura-shi, 329-1412 / JP | 07 /
FERRAND, Vincent Royston, SG8 5HE / GB | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/18] | Wilson, Nicola Ann Johnson Matthey Public Limited Company Johnson Matthey Technology Centre Blount's Court Road Sonning Common Reading, Berkshire RG4 9NH / GB | Application number, filing date | 22203988.5 | 27.10.2022 | [2023/18] | Priority number, date | US202163263390P | 02.11.2021 Original published format: US 202163263390 P | US202263377415P | 28.09.2022 Original published format: US 202263377415 P | [2023/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4173693 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/94, B01J23/63, B01J35/00, B01J29/68, B01J29/76, F01N3/10, B01J37/02 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (EP,US);
B01D53/9436 (EP);
B01D53/9472 (US);
B01D53/9477 (EP);
B01J23/10 (US);
B01J23/44 (US);
B01J23/464 (US);
B01J23/63 (EP);
B01J23/72 (US);
B01J23/745 (US);
B01J29/68 (EP,US);
B01J29/76 (EP,US);
B01J35/56 (US);
B01J37/0244 (EP);
B01J37/0246 (EP);
F01N3/101 (EP);
B01D2255/1021 (EP);
B01D2255/1023 (US);
B01D2255/1025 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2042 (EP);
B01D2255/2065 (EP);
B01D2255/20715 (EP);
B01D2255/20738 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20761 (EP,US);
B01D2255/407 (EP);
B01D2255/50 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9022 (EP);
B01D2255/9032 (US);
B01D2255/9035 (US);
B01D2255/908 (EP,US);
B01D2255/9155 (US);
B01D2257/406 (EP);
B01D2258/014 (EP);
F01N2510/063 (EP);
F01N2510/068 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] |
Former [2023/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATALYSATOREN FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON BENZINABGASEN MIT VERBESSERTER AMMONIAKEMISSIONSKONTROLLE | [2023/18] | English: | CATALYSTS FOR GASOLINE EXHAUST GAS TREATMENTS WITH IMPROVED AMMONIA EMISSION CONTROL | [2023/18] | French: | CATALYSEURS POUR TRAITEMENTS DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT D'ESSENCE AVEC CONTRÔLE AMÉLIORÉ DE L'ÉMISSION D'AMMONIAC | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 25.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH08281107 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,4,6,7,9,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] - [0017] *; | [X]EP2153896 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,6-8,10-13 * examples 2,7 * * tables 2,7 *; | [X]US2011030346 (NEUBAUER TORSTEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,10-15 * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] , [0039] - [0045] - [0048] , [0049] , [0056] - [0061] * * example 2 *; | [X]US2016047286 (SWALLOW DANIEL [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,10-13 * example 1 *; | [X]US2018169624 (CHANDLER GUY RICHARD [GB], et al) [X] 1,4,10-13 * example catalyst 2 *; | [X]US2019143311 (ANDO RYUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4,10-13,15 * paragraph [0034] * * example 1 *; | [X]US2019351397 (NUNAN JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6-8,10-13,15 * paragraph [0001] * * examples comparative 1,2 * * examples 1-3 *; | [X]US2019353068 (MOSER DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-15* paragraphs [0026] - [0030] - [0109] - [0115] - [0139] , [0152] , [0153] , [0169] , [0198] - [0203] * |