EP4175363 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RESTRICTING THE USE OF A VEHICLE OPERATOR'S TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 13.10.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] | 13.10.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 15.11.2023 [2023/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEOTAB Inc. 2440 Winston Park Drive Oakville, ON L6H 7V2 / CA | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fox, Stephen Michael Oakville, L6H 7V2 / CA | 02 /
Thayilchira, Jobin Oakville, L6H 7V2 / CA | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft mbB Steinerstraße 15/A 81369 München / DE | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 22203997.6 | 27.10.2022 | [2023/18] | Priority number, date | US202163273244P | 29.10.2021 Original published format: US 202163273244 P | US202217869076 | 20.07.2022 Original published format: US202217869076 | [2023/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4175363 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/04 | [2023/18] | CPC: |
H04W48/04 (EP);
H04W12/37 (EP);
H04W4/44 (EP);
H04W12/61 (EP);
H04W12/63 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] |
Former [2023/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR EINSCHRÄNKUNG DER VERWENDUNG EINES ENDGERÄTS EINES FAHRZEUGFÜHRERS | [2023/18] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR RESTRICTING THE USE OF A VEHICLE OPERATOR'S TERMINAL | [2023/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LIMITER L'UTILISATION D'UN TERMINAL D'UN OPÉRATEUR DE VÉHICULE | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | 06.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.10.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2008064446 (CAMP WILLIAM O [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8,15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 47] , [0 51] , [0076] * [A] 9; | [A]US2011304446 (BASSON SARA H [US], et al) [A] 10-12* paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2012040665 (LIU YALI [US], et al) [A] 5 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0 11] , [0 26] , [0 29] , [0032] , [0041] *; | [XI]WO2020181001 (KATASI INC [US]) [X] 1-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0134] , [0172] , [ 179] , [0206] , [ 395] , [ 396] , [0409]; figure 7 * [I] 9 |