EP4174738 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROTECTING TRAINABLE MODEL VALIDATION DATASETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Credo.AI Corp. 195 Page Mill Road Suite 115 Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | [2023/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Eli San Mateo, 94402 / US | 02 /
EISENBERG, Ian W. Palo Alto, 94306 / US | [2023/18] | Representative(s) | Haley Guiliano International LLP 26-28 Bedford Row London WC1R 4HE / GB | [2023/18] | Application number, filing date | 22204260.8 | 27.10.2022 | [2023/18] | Priority number, date | US202117511899 | 27.10.2021 Original published format: US202117511899 | [2023/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4174738 | Date: | 03.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4174738 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06N20/00, G06F21/62, G06N3/0455, G06N3/088 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
G06F21/6245 (EP);
G06N3/088 (EP,US);
G06F18/217 (US);
G06N3/0455 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2023/18] | G06N20/00, G06F21/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] |
Former [2023/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHUTZ VON TRAINIERBAREN MODELLVALIDIERUNGSDATENSÄTZEN | [2023/18] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROTECTING TRAINABLE MODEL VALIDATION DATASETS | [2023/18] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE PROTECTION D'ENSEMBLES DE DONNÉES DE VALIDATION DE MODÈLE POUVANT ÊTRE ENTRAÎNÉ | [2023/18] | Examination procedure | 02.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 02.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24184139.4 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2021097201 (WASICEK ARMIN [US], et al); |