EP4361997 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE, DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS, VEHICLE, COMPUTER PROGRAM, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Car Corporation 405 31 Göteborg / SE | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEREZ BARRERA, Oswaldo 40531 Göteborg / SE | 02 /
LENNARTSSON, Anders 40531 Göteborg / SE | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22204520.5 | 28.10.2022 | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4361997 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, B60W30/095 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
G08G1/166 (EP);
B60W30/0956 (EP,CN,US);
B60W30/09 (EP,CN,US);
B60Q1/50 (EP);
B60Q1/525 (EP);
B60W30/146 (US);
B60W40/02 (CN);
B60W40/105 (US);
B60W50/0097 (CN);
B60W50/0098 (CN);
B60W60/0015 (CN);
B60W60/0017 (EP);
B60W60/0027 (CN);
B60W60/00272 (EP);
G06V20/58 (US);
G06V40/10 (US);
B60Q1/507 (EP);
B60W2050/0043 (CN);
B60W2050/0052 (CN);
B60W2420/403 (US);
B60W2520/10 (EP);
B60W2554/4026 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2554/4041 (EP,US);
B60W2554/4042 (EP);
B60W2554/4045 (US);
B60W2554/80 (US);
B60W2554/802 (EP);
B60W2556/40 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS, DATENVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, FAHRZEUG, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2024/18] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE, DATA PROCESSING APPARATUS, VEHICLE, COMPUTER PROGRAM, AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2024/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN VÉHICULE, APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES, VÉHICULE, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2024/18] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2023 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 12.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017120804 (KENTLEY TIMOTHY DAVID [US], et al); | [XI]US2017329332 (PILARSKI THOMAS [US], et al); | [A]US2019359128 (HARPER JACOB AVI [US], et al); | [A]DE102019115425 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS LLC [US]); | [A]US2020241545 (ANTHONY SAMUEL ENGLISH [US]); | [A]US2022289179 (THOMAS STEPHEN L [US], et al) |