EP4177216 - SANITARY FITTING FOR DISPENSING PROCESSED LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.11.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | 17.11.2023 | Change - designated states | published on 20.12.2023 [2023/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BLANCO GmbH + Co KG Flehinger Strasse 59 75038 Oberderdingen / DE | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Funke, Thomas 75031 Eppingen / DE | 02 /
Stenvers, Olaf 68163 Mannheim / DE | 03 /
Keller, Stefan 74374 Zaberfeld / DE | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Ullrich & Naumann PartG mbB Schneidmühlstrasse 21 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 22204638.5 | 31.10.2022 | [2023/19] | Priority number, date | DE202110212428 | 04.11.2021 Original published format: DE102021212428 | [2023/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4177216 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/00, E03C1/04, A47J31/41, E03C1/044, E03C1/05 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
E03C1/0404 (EP);
E03C1/0411 (CN,US);
E03C1/0412 (CN,US);
B67D1/0021 (EP);
B67D1/0059 (EP);
E03C1/044 (EP,US);
E03C1/046 (US);
E03C1/055 (EP,CN);
E03C1/057 (EP);
B67D1/0857 (EP);
B67D1/0895 (EP);
E03C2001/0418 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] |
Former [2023/19] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SANITÄRARMATUR ZUR AUSGABE AUFBEREITETER FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2023/19] | English: | SANITARY FITTING FOR DISPENSING PROCESSED LIQUIDS | [2023/19] | French: | ROBINETTERIE SANITAIRE POUR DISTRIBUER DES LIQUIDES TRAITÉS | [2023/19] | Examination procedure | 10.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 10.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2007152074 (STOWE ELLIOTT V [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,10 * page 2, paragraph 15 - paragraph 23 * * page 3, paragraph 28 * * page 4, paragraph 51 - page 5, paragraph 67 * * page 6, paragraph 75 - paragraph 81 * * page 7, paragraph 86 - paragraph 93; figures 1-4 * [I] 4; | [X]WO2016040986 (XIA LI JUN [AU]) [X] 1-8,10 * page 1, paragraph 7 - page 6, paragraph 43 * * page 8, paragraph 45 - page 13, paragraph 76; figures 1-9 *; | [X]EP3533937 (UNITO SMART TECH LIMITED [CN]) [X] 1-10 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 42 - page 6, paragraph 56 * * page 9, paragraph 91 * * page 10, paragraph 93 - page 11, paragraph 117 * * page 16, paragraph 183 - page 19, paragraph 201; figure - *; | [XI]EP3766828 (BLANCO GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1-4,9,10 * the whole document *[I] 8 | by applicant | DE102013000773 | DE102013002236 | DE102019210435 |