EP4177951 - DISPLAY APPARATUS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2023 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 13.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jaehyun 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Seulki 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Choi, Seungha 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
Yoon, Kapsoo 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Lee, Woogeun 17113 Giheung-gu, Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 22204984.3 | 02.11.2022 | [2023/19] | Priority number, date | KR20210149949 | 03.11.2021 Original published format: KR 20210149949 | [2023/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4177951 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/12, H01L29/417, // H01L29/786 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
H01L27/1225 (EP,US);
H10K59/124 (KR);
H10K59/123 (US);
G09G3/3233 (US);
H01L27/124 (EP);
H01L27/1255 (EP,US);
H01L29/41733 (EP);
H01L29/7869 (KR,US);
H10K59/121 (KR);
H10K59/1213 (US);
H10K59/1216 (US);
H10K59/131 (KR);
H10K71/00 (US);
G09G2300/0426 (US);
G09G2300/0819 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2023/19] | English: | DISPLAY APPARATUS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2023/19] | French: | APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/19] | Examination procedure | 24.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/19] | 10.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2019181207 (KIM HONGSUK [KR]) [Y] 8* figure 11E *; | [XI]US2020091264 (LEE SEOK-HYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,3-7,9-14 * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0069] * * figures 4A-5,7 * [I] 2,15; | [XY]KR20210086441 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-3,5-7 * paragraph [0177] * * paragraph [0210]; figure 18 * [Y] 8 |