EP4177447 - ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.04.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yanmar Holdings Co., Ltd. 1-32, Chayamachi Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [2023/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASAZAKI, Shinsuke Osaka / JP | [2023/19] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. Postfach 70 04 25 81304 München / DE | [2023/19] | Application number, filing date | 22205498.3 | 04.11.2022 | [2023/19] | Priority number, date | JP20210180903 | 05.11.2021 Original published format: JP 2021180903 | [2023/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4177447 | Date: | 10.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | F01N13/00, F01N3/00, F01N13/18 | [2023/19] | CPC: |
F01N13/00 (EP);
F01N3/2066 (KR);
F01N13/08 (CN,KR);
F02M26/04 (US);
F01N13/1805 (EP);
F01N13/1816 (EP);
F01N3/00 (EP);
F01N3/021 (KR);
F02B37/18 (KR);
F02B39/00 (CN);
F02B67/00 (KR);
F02M26/10 (US);
F01N2340/06 (EP);
F01N2470/10 (EP);
F02M26/15 (US);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2023/19] | English: | ENGINE | [2023/19] | French: | MOTEUR | [2023/19] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 08.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005042940 (DEERE & CO [US]); | [A]US2018030875 (KAMO TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2013000002 |