EP4156886 - OLED DISPLAY PANEL WITH UNPATTERNED EMISSIVE STACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Display Corporation 250 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ 08618 / US | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HACK, Michael Ewing, NJ, 08618 / US | 02 /
WEAVER, Michael Stuart Ewing, NJ, 08618 / US | 03 /
THOMPSON, Nicholas J. Ewing, NJ, 08618 / US | 04 /
BROWN, Julia J. Ewing, NJ, 08618 / US | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/13] | Application number, filing date | 22206362.0 | 22.05.2020 | [2023/13] | Priority number, date | US201962851731P | 23.05.2019 Original published format: US 201962851731 P | US201962933046P | 08.11.2019 Original published format: US 201962933046 P | US202016880178 | 21.05.2020 Original published format: US202016880178 | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4156886 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H10K59/38, H10K50/13 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
H10K59/38 (EP,CN,US);
H10K50/125 (KR);
H10K50/131 (CN,US);
H01L27/14621 (KR);
H10K50/11 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/115 (KR);
H10K50/17 (KR);
H10K59/35 (CN);
H10K2101/00 (KR);
H10K2101/10 (EP,US);
H10K2102/331 (US);
H10K59/32 (EP);
Y02E10/549 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] |
Former [2023/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | OLED-ANZEIGETAFEL MIT UNGEMUSTERTEM EMISSIONSSTAPEL | [2023/13] | English: | OLED DISPLAY PANEL WITH UNPATTERNED EMISSIVE STACK | [2023/13] | French: | PANNEAU D'AFFICHAGE À OLED À EMPILEMENT ÉMISSIF SANS MOTIFS | [2023/13] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 26.06.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP20176156.6 / EP3742494 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US8878168 (BAE JAE-WOO [KR], et al) [Y] 11-15* column 6, lines 15-23; figure 5 *; | [X]KR20160000569 (LG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,3,4,8-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0018] , [0020] , [0021] , [0112] - [0135] - [0148]; figures 6-9 *; | [Y]US2017162829 (LAI WEILIN [CN], et al) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0037]; figure 2 *; | [Y]EP3188272 (SAMSUNG DISPLAY CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] , [0036] , [0037] , [0128] , [0134]; figure 11 *; | [Y]CN109065740 (BOE TECHNOLOGY GROUP CO LTD) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0007] - [0015] - [0020] , [0045]; figure 3 *; | [XY]US2018374409 (LEE SANGYOON [KR], et al) [X] 1,3-10 * paragraphs [0010] , [0023] , [0028] , [0029] , [0035] , [0080] - [0089]; figures 1-11 * [Y] 2,11-15 | by applicant | US4769292 | US5247190 | US5703436 | US5707745 | US5834893 | US5844363 | US6013982 | US6087196 | US6091195 | US6097147 | US6294398 | US6303238 | US6337102 | US6468819 | US2003230980 | US2004174116 | US7279704 | US7431968 | US7968146 | US2017229663 | - BALDO et al., "Highly Efficient Phosphorescent Emission from Organic Electroluminescent Devices", Nature, (19980000), vol. 395, doi:10.1038/25954, pages 151 - 154, XP001002103 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/25954 | - BALDO et al., "Very high-efficiency green organic light-emitting devices based on electrophosphorescence", Appl. Phys. Lett., (19990000), vol. 75, no. 3, doi:10.1063/1.124258, pages 4 - 6, XP012023409 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.124258 | WO2007US23098 | WO2009US42829 |