EP4369649 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR QUANTUM KEY DISTRIBUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terra Quantum AG Kornhausstrasse 25 9000 St. Gallen / CH | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vyatkin, Mikhail 9000 St. Gallen / CH | 02 /
Gutor, Alexander 9000 St. Gallen / CH | 03 /
Kirsanov, Nikita 9000 St. Gallen / CH | 04 /
Zhdanova, Ekaterina 9000 St. Gallen / CH | 05 /
Yarovikov, Mikhail 9000 St. Gallen / CH | 06 /
Smirnov, Alexander 9000 St. Gallen / CH | 07 /
Bezruchenko, Alexander 9000 St. Gallen / CH | 08 /
Lesovik, Gordey 9000 St. Gallen / CH | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Kretschmann, Dennis Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstraße 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/20] | Kretschmann, Dennis Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22206735.7 | 10.11.2022 | [2024/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4369649 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
H04L9/0855 (EP,CN);
H04B10/70 (EP,KR);
G02B27/0012 (US);
H01S3/06716 (KR);
H01S3/06787 (US);
H01S3/094003 (KR);
H01S3/10023 (KR);
H01S3/1608 (KR);
H01S3/1611 (KR);
H01S3/1616 (KR);
H01S3/1618 (KR);
H04B10/2942 (CN);
H04B10/503 (KR);
H04B10/508 (CN);
H04B10/85 (KR);
H04L9/085 (CN);
H04L9/0852 (US);
H04L2209/08 (CN);
H04L2209/34 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, ME, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR QUANTENSCHLÜSSELVERTEILUNG | [2024/20] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR QUANTUM KEY DISTRIBUTION | [2024/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE DISTRIBUTION QUANTIQUE DE CLÉS | [2024/20] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]EP1075095 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]); | [AD]US11165570 (PARKIN NEIL [GB], et al); | by applicant | US2003035204 | US11271358 |