EP4156724 - MONITORING OBJECTS CAPABLE OF WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.02.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM ERICSSON (PUBL) 16483 Stockholm / SE | [2023/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOHALIK, Swarup Kumar 560037 BANGALORE / IN | 02 /
JAYARAMAN, Mahesh Babu 560068 BANGALORE / IN | [2023/13] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2024/21] |
Former [2023/13] | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 22206968.4 | 20.06.2016 | [2023/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4156724 | Date: | 29.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4156724 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/02, H04W4/80, H04W64/00, G08B21/24, G06F21/88, G06F21/55, H04W4/021, G08B13/14, G08B21/02, H04W12/126, // H04W12/00 | [2023/13] | CPC: |
G06F21/554 (EP);
H04W4/021 (EP,CN);
H04W4/029 (CN,US);
G06F21/88 (EP);
G08B21/24 (EP,CN);
H04M1/72454 (US);
H04W12/126 (EP);
H04W4/023 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
H04W64/00 (EP,CN);
H04W8/005 (US);
G08B13/1427 (EP);
G08B21/0227 (EP);
G08B21/0277 (EP);
H04L67/535 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] |
Former [2023/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNG VON OBJEKTEN MIT FÄHIGKEIT ZUR DRAHTLOSEN KOMMUNIKATION | [2023/13] | English: | MONITORING OBJECTS CAPABLE OF WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS | [2023/13] | French: | SURVEILLANCE D'OBJETS CAPABLES DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL | [2023/13] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 24.10.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | 24.10.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP16906200.7 / EP3473023 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 24.10.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.10.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 24.10.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 24.10.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.10.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7880613 (MAENG JOON [US]); | [IAY]US2014145845 (SATTARI ASHKAN [CA]); | [YA]US2016117899 (CHEVALIER JULIEN [FR], et al) |